Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1786833

EP1786833 - DETECTION, ISOLATION AND USES OF RENALASE (MONOAMINE OXIDASE C) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.10.2013
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.11.2013  [2013/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yale University
Two Whitney Avenue
New Haven, CT 06510 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/21]For all designated states
Yale University
Two Whitney Avenue
New Haven, CT 06511 / US
Inventor(s)01 / XU, Jianchao
Two Whitney Avenue
New Haven, CT 06511 / US
02 / DESIR, Gary
Two Whitney Avenue
New Haven, CT 06511 / US
 [2007/21]
Representative(s)Tollervey, Rebecca Marie , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/21]Tollervey, Rebecca Marie , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date05730232.521.03.2005
[2007/21]
WO2005US09248
Priority number, dateUS20040554552P19.03.2004         Original published format: US 554552 P
US20040615452P01.10.2004         Original published format: US 615452 P
[2007/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005089505
Date:29.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1786833
Date:23.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005
[2007/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.08.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/02, C12N1/20, C12N15/00, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/34, C12Q1/68, C12P21/06, C12P21/04, A61K38/44, C07H21/04, C07K1/00, C10L1/00, C12N9/06
[2009/09]
Former International [2007/38]C12N9/02, C12N1/20, C12N15/00, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/34, C12Q1/68, C12P21/06, C12P21/04, A61K38/44, C07H21/04, C07K1/00, C07K16/00
Former International [2007/21]C07K14/435
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/21]
Extension statesAL06.10.2006
BA06.10.2006
HR06.10.2006
LV06.10.2006
MK06.10.2006
YU06.10.2006
TitleGerman:DETEKTION, ISOLIERUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN VON RENALASE (MONOAMINOXIDASE C)[2007/21]
English:DETECTION, ISOLATION AND USES OF RENALASE (MONOAMINE OXIDASE C)[2007/21]
French:DETECTION, ISOLEMENT ET UTILISATIONS DE LA RENALASE (MONOAMINE OXYDASE DE TYPE C)[2007/21]
Entry into regional phase06.10.2006National basic fee paid 
06.10.2006Search fee paid 
06.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.2006Examination requested  [2007/21]
02.10.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/48]
11.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2013/48]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.05.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201309   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0157190  (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,14-18,21,22,27-30,32,40,50,51,53-58 * claims 1,9,10,27 * * page 1, line 6 * * page 5, lines 22-24 * * page 19, lines 4,AND,FOLLOWING * * page 30, line 17 AND FOLLOWING * * page 34, line 26 AND FOLLOWING * * page 35, line 15 AND FOLLOWING * * page 38, line 27 * * page 63, line 29 - line 31 * * page 72, line 34 AND FOLLOWING * * page 166; table 3 * * sequence SEQ ID NO 452 AND 1436 * * Chapter: 4.5 Hosts, 4.8 Gene Therapy, 4.13 Antibodies * * claim 17 * [Y] 52;
 [X]WO0111053  (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * claim 1 * * page 1, line 13 * * page 3, line 31 * * page 4, line 18 *;
 [Y]WO9919495  (ICOS CORP [US]) [Y] 52 * claims 24-26 *
 [XD]  - "Homo sapiens chromosome 10 open reading frame 59, mRNA (cDNA clone MGC:12474 IMAGE:3828014), complete cds.", EMBL, (20010404), Database accession no. BC005364, URL: EBI, XP002509106 [XD] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Human polynucleotide SEQ ID NO 452.", Geneseq, (20011106), Database accession no. AAK51907, URL: EBI, XP002509107 [X] 1-7,9-12,14-17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Human protein SEQ ID NO 1436.", Geneseq, (20011106), Database accession no. AAM78774, URL: EBI, XP002509108 [X] 1-7,9-12,14-17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Sequence 13042 from Patent EP1074617.", EMBL, (20031217), Database accession no. AX878137, URL: EBI, XP002509109 [X] 8 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Homo sapiens mRNA; cDNA DKFZp686O1980 (from clone DKFZp686O1980)", EMBL, (20030830), Database accession no. BX648154, URL: EBI, XP002509110 [X] 8 * the whole document *
International search[A]  - LI M., "High-Level Expression of Human Liver Monoamine Oxidase A in Pichia pastoris: Comparison with the Enzyme Expressed in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (200202), vol. 24, pages 152 - 162, XP003016161

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.2001.1546
by applicantWO0111053
 WO0157190
 US6548286
 US6541606
 US4256108
 US4160452
 US4265874
    - BOULTON ET AL., "Biogenic Amine Adducts, Monoamine Oxidase Inhibitors, and Smoking", LANCET, (19880116), vol. 1, no. 8577, pages 114 - 155
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402
    - KOTIN, HUM. GENE THER., (1994), vol. 5, pages 793 - 801
    - MATSUSHITA ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1998), vol. 5, page 938
    - BRENNER, B. M.; DEEN, W. M.; ROBERTSON, C. R., "Determinants of glomerular filtration rate", ANNU REV PHYSIOL, (1976), vol. 38, pages 11 - 19
    - LIN, F. K. ET AL., "Cloning and expression of the human erythropoietin gene", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1985), vol. 82, pages 7580 - 4
    - JACOBS, K. ET AL., "Isolation and characterization of genomic and cDNA clones of human erythropoietin", NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, pages 806 - 10
    - HUMES, H. D., "Acute renal failure: prevailing challenges and prospects for the future", KIDNEY INT SUPPL, (1995), vol. 50, pages 26 - 32
    - WOLFE, R. A. ET AL., "Comparison of mortality in all patients on dialysis, patients on dialysis awaiting transplantation, and recipients of a first cadaveric transplant", N ENGL J MED, (1999), vol. 341, pages 1725 - 30
    - OBERG, B. P. ET AL., "Increased prevalence of oxidant stress and inflammation in patients with moderate to severe chronic kidney disease", KIDNEY INT, (2004), vol. 65, pages 1009 - 16
    - KOOMANS, H. A.; BLANKESTIJN, P. J.; JOLES, J. A., "Sympathetic hyperactivity in chronic renal failure: a wake-up call", J AM SOC NEPHROL, (2004), vol. 15, pages 524 - 37
    - JOLES, J. A.; KOOMANS, H. A., "Causes and consequences of increased sympathetic activity in renal disease", HYPERTENSION, (2004), vol. 43, pages 699 - 706
    - STRAUSBERG, R. L.; FEINGOLD, E. A.; KLAUSNER, R. D.; COLLINS, F. S., "The mammalian gene collection", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 286, pages 455 - 7
    - BINDA, C.; MATTEVI, A.; EDMONDSON, D. E., "Structure-function relationships in flavoenzyme-dependent amine oxidations: a comparison of polyamine oxidase and monoamine oxidase", J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 23973 - 6
    - JALKANEN, S.; SALMI, M., "Cell surface monoamine oxidases: enzymes in search of a function", EMBO J, (2001), vol. 20, pages 3893 - 901