Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1730151

EP1730151 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING OXYCODONE HYDROCHLORIDE HAVING LESS THAN 25 PPM 14-HYDROXYCODEINONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.02.2011
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2020New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.
1, rue Jean Piret
2350 Luxembourg / LU
[2016/26]
Former [2008/23]For all designated states
EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.
2, avenue Charles de Gaulle
1653 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2006/50]For all designated states
EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.
122 Boulevard de la Petrusse
2330 Luxembourg / LU
Inventor(s)01 / CHAPMAN, Robert
4 Jefferson Court
Downingtown, PA 19335 / US
02 / RIDER, Lonn, S.
18 Barbs Hill Road
Foster, RI 02825 / US
03 / HONG, Qi
31 Grape Shot Road
Sharon, MA 02607 / US
04 / KYLE, Donald
29 Weatherfield Drive
Newtown, PA 18940 / US
05 / KUPPER, Robert
755 Major Potter Road
East Greenwich, RI 02818 / US
 [2010/46]
Former [2007/01]01 / CHAPMAN, Robert
111 Cassandra Lane
North Kingstown, RI 02852 / US
02 / RIDER, Lonn, S.
18 Barbs Hill Road
Foster, RI 02825 / US
03 / HONG, Qi
31 Grape Shot Road
Sharon, MA 02607 / US
04 / KYLE, Donald
29 Weatherfield Drive
Newtown, PA 18940 / US
05 / KUPPER, Robert
755 Major Potter Road
East Greenwich, RI 02818 / US
Former [2006/50]01 / CHAPMAN, Robert
111 Cassandra Lane
North Kingstown, RI 02852 / US
02 / RIDER, Lonn, S.
940 Quaker Lane, Apt. 222
Warwick, RI 02818 / US
03 / HONG, Qi
31 Grape Shot Road
Sharon, MA 02607 / US
04 / KYLE, Donald
29 Weatherfield Drive
Newtown, PA 18940 / US
05 / KUPPER, Robert
498 Washington Street
Coventry, RI 02816 / US
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/50]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date05730345.530.03.2005
[2006/50]
WO2005US10666
Priority number, dateUS20040557492P30.03.2004         Original published format: US 557492 P
US20040601534P13.08.2004         Original published format: US 601534 P
US20040620072P18.10.2004         Original published format: US 620072 P
US20050648625P31.01.2005         Original published format: US 648625 P
US20050651778P10.02.2005         Original published format: US 651778 P
[2006/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005097801
Date:20.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1730151
Date:13.12.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005
[2006/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1730151
Date:09.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.10.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:C07D489/00, C07D489/08
[2006/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/50]
Extension statesAL14.09.2006
BA14.09.2006
HR14.09.2006
LV14.09.2006
MK14.09.2006
YU14.09.2006
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OXYCODONHYDROCHLORID MIT WENIGER ALS 25 PPM 14-HYDROXYCODEINON[2006/50]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING OXYCODONE HYDROCHLORIDE HAVING LESS THAN 25 PPM 14-HYDROXYCODEINONE[2006/50]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'HYDROCHLORURE D'OXYCODONE PRESENTANT MOINS DE 25 PPM DE 14-HYDROXYCODEINONE[2006/50]
Entry into regional phase14.09.2006National basic fee paid 
14.09.2006Search fee paid 
14.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/50]
08.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
05.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.02.2010
23.02.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2010Fee for grant paid
08.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10011787.8  / EP2319846
EP10011788.6  / EP2316837
EP10011791.0  / EP2311839
EP10011792.8  / EP2305683
EP10011793.6  / EP2314589
EP11186168.8  / EP2426132
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.12.2011  12.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Elend, Almut Susanne
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 02  09.12.2011  06.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  08.12.2011  16.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Pharma AG
Erlenstrasse 1
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/03]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2011  12.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Elend, Almut Susanne
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 02  09.12.2011   
Actavis group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistraße 14
80333 München / DE
 03  08.12.2011   
Acino Pharma AG
Erlenstrasse 1
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2012/02]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2011   
Elend, Almut Susanne
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
17.01.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.07.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.11.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.05.2013
14.05.2013Date of oral proceedings
19.09.2013Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.11.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
20.11.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2019
06.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2020Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition13.03.2014Appeal received No.  T0613/14
12.05.2014Statement of grounds filed
11.01.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
08.01.2014Appeal received No.  T0069/14
18.03.2014Statement of grounds filed
11.01.2019Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
11.01.2019Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004016618  (NORAMCO INC [US]) [X] 45-47 * claims 1,43 *;
 [X]DE296916  (MARTIN FREUND, EDMUND SPEYER) [X] 1,7 * page 1, column 1 - column 2; examples I,III *;
 [X]ES2121554  (UNIV SANTIAGO COMPOSTELA [ES]) [X] 31 * page 6, lines 3-7,24-28; compound 13 *;
 [PX]WO2004108090  (HALSEY DRUG COMPANY [US], et al) [PX] 1-53 * examples 5-7; claim 1 *;
 [PX]WO2004050025  (FOREST LABORATORIES [US], et al) [PX] 45-53 * claims 1,12 *;
 [PX]FR2850576  (ETHYPHARM SA [FR]) [PX] 45-53 * example 1 *;
 [E]US2005095291  (OSHLACK BENJAMIN [US], et al) [E] 45-47 * paragraphs [0239] , [0251] , [0293] , [0305] , [0362] , [0452]; claim 67 *
 [X]  - RENZI JR N L ET AL, "Quantitative GLC determination of oxycodone in human plasma", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES 1979 UNITED STATES, (1979), vol. 68, no. 1, pages 43 - 45, XP002428746 [X] 45-47 * page 45, paragraph LAST *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600680115
 [Y]  - KRASSNIG R ET AL, "OPTIMIZATION OF THE SYNTHESIS OF OXYCODONE AND 5-METHYLOXYCODONE", ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, VERLAG CHEMIE. WEINHEIM, DE, (1996), vol. 329, pages 325 - 326, XP008055004 [Y] 1-44 * column 2; compounds 1, 7 *
 [Y]  - IIJIMA I ET AL, "Studies in the (+) morphinan series. V. Synthesis and biological properties of (+) naloxone", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY 1978 UNITED STATES, (1978), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 398 - 400, XP002428747 [Y] 1-44 * page 399, column 2; compounds 2, 3, 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00202a018
International search[Y]US6262266  (CHIU FANG-TING [US], et al);
 [Y]US6403798  (CHIU FANG-TING [US], et al);
 [Y]US6008355  (HUANG BAO-SHAN [US], et al)