Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1730151 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1730151



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2672
31.01.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.01.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.01.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.01.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.01.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.01.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.01.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.01.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.01.2020 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
22.01.2020 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 30
22.01.2020 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
22.01.2020 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.01.2020 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.01.2020 Means of redress Opposition 2
27.11.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
08.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
08.11.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
31.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
31.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.10.2019 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
08.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
08.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
08.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
02.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.10.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.10.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.05.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.05.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.04.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
23.04.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.04.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.04.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.04.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.04.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.04.2019 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.04.2019 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.04.2019 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.04.2019 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.03.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.03.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.03.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.03.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.03.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 11
05.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.02.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
22.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.01.2019 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
17.01.2019 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
02.01.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
02.01.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
02.01.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
02.01.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
02.01.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
02.01.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
02.01.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
02.01.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
21.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
17.12.2018 Claims Appeal 1
17.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.12.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.11.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.09.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 15
18.09.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 15
18.09.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 15
18.09.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
18.09.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
18.09.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 15
18.09.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
18.09.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
13.09.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
27.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
21.08.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.08.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.07.2018 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.07.2018 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.07.2018 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.07.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
20.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.07.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.07.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
17.07.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.07.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.06.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
18.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.06.2018 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.06.2018 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.06.2018 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.06.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
12.06.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
12.06.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
12.06.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
07.06.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.04.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
09.04.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.06.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.06.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
01.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
30.05.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
18.05.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 10
18.02.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
12.02.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
29.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.09.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.09.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
26.09.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
12.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
07.08.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 19
07.08.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
07.08.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
07.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.08.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.08.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 21
03.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
13.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.06.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 7
16.05.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.05.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.05.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.05.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
12.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.05.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 56
12.05.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
12.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.05.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
28.03.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.03.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.03.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.03.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.03.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
18.03.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.03.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.03.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.03.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.03.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.03.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.03.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.03.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 56
13.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.03.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.01.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
14.01.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
13.01.2014 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
13.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
10.01.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
09.01.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
08.01.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.12.2013 Request for correction Opposition 4
18.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
08.11.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
08.11.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
08.11.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
08.11.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.11.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
08.11.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.11.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 25
19.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.09.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
13.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
13.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.09.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
10.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
10.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
10.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.09.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
02.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
08.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
31.07.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.07.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
26.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
26.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
25.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.07.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
19.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.07.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 38
19.07.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.07.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 38
19.07.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 21
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
19.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.06.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
05.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2012 Annex Opposition 2
09.11.2012 Annex Opposition 2
09.11.2012 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
09.11.2012 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
08.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
05.11.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.11.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.10.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 4
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.07.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.07.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 64
24.05.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.05.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 3
15.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.05.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.12.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.12.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.12.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
09.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
09.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
09.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
09.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
09.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.12.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
08.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
08.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
08.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
08.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
05.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
05.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
05.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
05.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 133
05.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
06.04.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.02.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.01.2011 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
08.10.2010 Description Search / examination 1
08.10.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
08.10.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
08.10.2010 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
22.06.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.06.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
22.06.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.06.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 63
05.05.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
05.05.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
05.05.2010 Description Search / examination 54
05.05.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.03.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.03.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.02.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.02.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.02.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
09.02.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
09.02.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.02.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.02.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
08.02.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.01.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.01.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
22.01.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
22.01.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
22.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
22.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
22.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
22.01.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 12
02.11.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
28.10.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.10.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
23.10.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.10.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.04.2009 Description Search / examination 1
09.04.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
03.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
03.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
03.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
13.02.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.02.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.09.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
25.09.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 14
25.09.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.09.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.06.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
05.06.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
21.05.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.05.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.05.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.05.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
18.04.2008 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 7
25.03.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.03.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.11.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
08.11.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.10.2007 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.09.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.06.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
22.05.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 13
22.05.2007 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
16.05.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.05.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.05.2007 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
09.05.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.04.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.04.2007 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
12.03.2007 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
11.01.2007 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
14.12.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
28.11.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
17.11.2006 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.11.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.11.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
16.10.2006 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
14.09.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
14.09.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.09.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.08.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.08.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 73
07.11.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 68
07.11.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 64
07.11.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 83
07.11.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 79
20.10.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
20.10.2005 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 70