Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1732812

EP1732812 - ACTIVE FILM ADHERED TO FLEXIBLE PACKAGES AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.05.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
08.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CSP Technologies, Inc.
960 West Veterans Boulevard
Auburn, Alabama 36832 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
CSP Technologies, Inc.
960 West Veterans Boulevard
Auburn Alabama 36832 / US
Former [2006/51]For all designated states
CSP Technologies, Inc.
1030 Riverfront Center P.O. Box 710 Amsterdam
New York 12010 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SAGONA, Peter, J.
161 Ridgeview Drive
Pottstown, PA 19465 / US
02 / FREEDMAN, Jonathan, R.
2213 Brenton Lane
Auburn, AL 36830 / US
03 / GIRAUD, Jean Pierre
12, Avenue du Général Michel Bizot
75012 Paris / FR
 [2012/06]
Former [2011/48]01 / SAGONA, Peter, J.
161 Ridgeview Drive
Pottstown, PA 19465 / US
02 / FREEDMAN, Jonathan, R.
2213 Brenton Lane
Auburn, AL 36830 / US
03 / GIRAUD, Jean Pierre
7, rue de la Nativité
75012 Paris / FR
Former [2007/19]01 / SAGONA, Peter, J.
161 Ridgeview Drive
Pottstown, PA 19465 / US
02 / FREEDMAN, Jonathan, R.
2213 Brenton Lane
Auburn, AL 36830 / US
03 / GIRAUD, Jean Pierre
7 Rue de la Nativite
75012 Paris / FR
Former [2006/51]01 / SAGONA, Peter, J.
161 Ridgeview Drive
Pottstown, PA 19465 / US
02 / FREEDMAN, Jonathan, R.
2213 Brenton Lane
Auburn, AL 36830 / US
03 / GIRAUD, Jean Pierre
Rue de la Nativite
75012 Paris / FR
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2012/24]Stevens, Ian Edward
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2006/51]Stevens, Ian Edward
Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date05730611.028.03.2005
[2006/51]
WO2005US10347
Priority number, dateUS20040556723P26.03.2004         Original published format: US 556723 P
[2006/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005095216
Date:13.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1732812
Date:20.12.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005
[2006/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1732812
Date:13.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.10.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:B65C9/25, C09J5/00, B65B61/20
[2009/26]
Former International [2006/51]B65C9/25, C09J5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/51]
TitleGerman:AN FLEXIBLE VERPACKUNGEN GEKLEBTER AKTIVER FILM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2006/51]
English:ACTIVE FILM ADHERED TO FLEXIBLE PACKAGES AND METHOD THEREOF[2006/51]
French:FILM ACTIF COLLE A DES EMBALLAGES FLEXIBLES ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE[2006/51]
Entry into regional phase26.10.2006National basic fee paid 
26.10.2006Search fee paid 
26.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.10.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/51]
01.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2012Fee for grant paid
08.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.12.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.03.2013  31.03.2014  WITHDRAWN
Constantia Teich GmbH
Mühlhofen 4
3200 Weinburg / AT
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner
Operngasse 4
P.O. Box 96
1010 Wien / AT
 02  13.03.2013  19.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2019/42]
Former [2019/27]
Opponent(s)01  13.03.2013  31.03.2014  WITHDRAWN
Constantia Teich GmbH
Mühlhofen 4
3200 Weinburg / AT
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner
Operngasse 4
P.O. Box 96
1010 Wien / AT
 02  13.03.2013  19.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Patent Management
Industriepark Höchst, G 860
DE-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2016/36]
Opponent(s)01  13.03.2013  31.03.2014  WITHDRAWN
Constantia Teich GmbH
Mühlhofen 4
3200 Weinburg / AT
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner
Operngasse 4
P.O. Box 96
1010 Wien / AT
 02  13.03.2013  19.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Hütter, Klaus
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Patent Management
Industriepark Höchst, G 860
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2014/19]
Opponent(s)01  13.03.2013  31.03.2014  WITHDRAWN
Constantia Teich GmbH
Mühlhofen 4
3200 Weinburg / AT
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner
Mahlerstrasse 9
1010 Wien / AT
 02  13.03.2013  19.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2013/17]
Opponent(s)01  13.03.2013  18.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Constantia Teich GmbH
Mühlhofen 4
3200 Weinburg / AT
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner
Mahlerstrasse 9
1010 Wien / AT
 02  13.03.2013  19.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
17.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
28.05.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.05.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition07.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1432/15
07.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
20.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1432/15
07.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
03.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.03.2005
AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
TR13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
ES24.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
IE28.03.2013
LU28.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
TR13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
ES24.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
IE28.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2014/07]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
ES24.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
IE28.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/47]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
ES24.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
ES24.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/15]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/13]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/11]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
Former [2013/10]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
Former [2013/09]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
Former [2012/48]FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
Former [2012/47]LT13.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[XA]JP2000127294  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,3,6,8,9;
 [XA]JPH0396334  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 9;
 [X]JPH05193064  (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US6010715  (WICK JOHN J [US] ET AL) [A] 1,2 * figure -; claim - *
International search[A]US5698217