Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1738383

EP1738383 - SIGNALING DEVICE FOR A PROTECTIVE CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.04.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
15.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pilz GmbH & Co. KG
Felix-Wankel-Strasse 2
73760 Ostfildern / DE
[2007/01]
Inventor(s)01 / PULLMANN, Jürgen
Wolfshalde 78
73061 Ebersbach / DE
02 / ZINSER, Christoph
Pappelweg 3
72649 Wolfschlugen / DE
03 / HORNUNG, Günter
Langwiesenstrasse 8
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
04 / FLEINER, Jürgen
Gotlandstrasse 11
72768 Reutlingen / DE
 [2007/01]
Representative(s)Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/01]Duhme, Torsten , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date05731057.523.03.2005
[2007/01]
WO2005EP03073
Priority number, dateDE2004102099519.04.2004         Original published format: DE102004020995
DE2004103191823.06.2004         Original published format: DE102004031918
[2007/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005101439
Date:27.10.2005
Language:DE
[2005/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1738383
Date:03.01.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005
[2007/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1738383
Date:05.05.2010
Language:DE
[2010/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01H47/00
[2007/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MELDEGERÄT FÜR EINE SICHERHEITSSCHALTUNG[2007/01]
English:SIGNALING DEVICE FOR A PROTECTIVE CIRCUIT[2007/01]
French:APPAREIL DE SIGNALISATION POUR CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION[2007/01]
Entry into regional phase24.10.2006National basic fee paid 
24.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.10.2006Examination requested  [2007/01]
16.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.10.2009
15.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
21.10.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
18.02.2010Fee for grant paid
18.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 02  04.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
EUCHNER GmbH + Co. KG
Kohlhammerstrasse 16
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard, et al
Patentanwalt
Jurastrasse 1
73087 Bad Boll / DE
 03  05.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
K.A. Schmersal GmbH
Möddinghofe 30
42279 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 04  21.06.2019  23.10.2019  INTERVENTION WITHDRAWN
elobau GmbH & Co. KG
Zeppelinstr. 44
88299 Leutkirch im Allgäu / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoppe, Lars
VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Edisonstraße 2
87437 Kempten / DE
 [2019/48]
Former [2019/32]
Opponent(s)01  02.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 02  04.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
EUCHNER GmbH + Co. KG
Kohlhammerstrasse 16
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard, et al
Patentanwalt
Jurastrasse 1
73087 Bad Boll / DE
 03  05.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
K.A. Schmersal GmbH
Möddinghofe 30
42279 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 04  21.06.2019   
elobau GmbH & Co. KG
Zeppelinstr. 44
88299 Leutkirch im Allgäu / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoppe, Lars
VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Edisonstraße 2
87437 Kempten / DE
Former [2019/31]
Opponent(s)01  02.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 02  04.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
EUCHNER GmbH + Co. KG
Kohlhammerstrasse 16
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard, et al
Patentanwalt
Jurastrasse 1
73087 Bad Boll / DE
 03  05.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
K.A. Schmersal GmbH
Möddinghofe 30
42279 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 04  21.06.2019   
elobau GmbH & Co. KG
Zeppelinstr. 44
88299 Leutkirch im Allgäu / DE
Former [2015/30]
Opponent(s)01  02.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 02  04.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
EUCHNER GmbH + Co. KG
Kohlhammerstrasse 16
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard, et al
Jurastrasse 1
73087 Bad Boll / DE
 03  05.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
K.A. Schmersal GmbH
Möddinghofe 30
42279 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/49]
Opponent(s)01  02.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 02  04.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
EUCHNER GmbH + Co. KG
Kohlhammerstrasse 16
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur, et al
Patentanwälte Bartels & Partner
Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
 03  05.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
K.A. Schmersal GmbH
Möddinghofe 30
42279 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/29]
Opponent(s)01  02.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 02  04.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
EUCHNER GmbH + Co. KG
Kohlhammerstrasse 16
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur, et al
Patentanwälte Bartels & Partner
Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
 03  05.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
K.A. Schmersal GmbH & Co.
Möddinghofe 30
D-42279 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/24]
Opponent(s)01  02.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 02  04.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
EUCHNER GmbH + Co. KG
Kohlhammerstrasse 16
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Crazzolara, Helmut, et al
Patentanwälte Bartels & Partner, Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
 03  05.02.2011  15.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
K.A. Schmersal GmbH & Co.
Möddinghofe 30
D-42279 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2011/11]
Opponent(s)01  02.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 02  04.02.2011   
Euchner GmbH & Co.
Kohlhammerstr. 16
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Crazzolara, Helmut, et al
Patentanwälte Bartels & Partner, Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
 03  05.02.2011   
K.A. Schmersal Holding GmbH & Co. KG
Moeddinghofe 30
42279 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2011/10]
Opponent(s)01  02.02.2011   
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
14.03.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.09.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.2012Reply to a communication from the opposition division
25.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.03.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.04.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition10.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1161/15
11.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
27.05.2015Appeal received No.  T1161/15
29.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
22.05.2015Appeal received No.  T1161/15
29.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
01.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1161/15
27.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
31.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
HU05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
AT23.03.2011
LU23.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
GB23.03.2016
ES24.03.2016
SE24.03.2016
[2017/44]
Former [2017/08]CY05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
HU05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
AT23.03.2011
LU23.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
GB23.03.2016
SE24.03.2016
Former [2016/52]CY05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
HU05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
AT23.03.2011
LU23.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
SE24.03.2016
Former [2013/45]CY05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
HU05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
AT23.03.2011
LU23.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2013/44]CY05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
AT23.03.2011
LU23.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2013/42]CY05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
AT23.03.2011
LU23.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2011/11]CY05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
Former [2011/09]CY05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
Former [2011/07]CY05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
Former [2011/03]CY05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
Former [2011/01]FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
Former [2010/45]NL05.05.2010
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP1363306  (K.A. SCHMERSAL GMBH & CO) [DX] 1,3,6-8,11 * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0032]; figures 1-3 *;
 [AP]WO2004105067  (PILZ GMBH & CO; HORNUNG, GUENTER) [AP] 1,11 * pages 10-11; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4570109  (NICOLAI ET AL) [A] 1,11 * column 4, lines 67,68; figure 1 *