Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1771759

EP1771759 - WAVEGUIDE ASSEMBLY AND CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.02.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsch UK
Castleham Industrial Estate 4 Stanier Road
St. Leonard-on-Sea, East Sussex TN38 09RF / GB
[2007/15]
Inventor(s)01 / READ, Ian James, Bae Systems ATC
PO Box 5
Filton, Bristol BS34 7QW / GB
02 / BANNISTER, Gareth Leslie, Deutsch Limited
4 Stanier Road
St Leonards on Sea, East Sussex TN38 9RF / GB
 [2007/15]
Representative(s)Boden, Keith McMurray
Fry Heath & Spence LLP
Unit A, Faraday Court
Faraday Road
Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/15]Boden, Keith McMurray
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
Application number, filing date05732280.220.04.2005
[2007/15]
WO2005GB50054
Priority number, dateGB2004000876220.04.2004         Original published format: GB 0408762
EP2004025230920.04.2004         Original published format: EP 04252309
[2007/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005103786
Date:03.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1771759
Date:11.04.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005
[2007/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44, G02B6/38, B23B31/00, B29C70/86, B29C70/44
[2007/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/15]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WELLENLEITERBAUGRUPPE UND VERBINDER[2007/15]
English:WAVEGUIDE ASSEMBLY AND CONNECTOR[2007/15]
French:ENSEMBLE GUIDE D'ONDES ET CONNECTEUR[2007/15]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2006National basic fee paid 
20.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/15]
16.01.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
16.04.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
18.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.03.2017
16.03.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
21.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
06.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination18.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0838/18
16.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP10012766.1   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 02.11.2010
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2008
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
25.01.2013Request for further processing filed
25.01.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.02.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.07.2009Request for further processing filed
07.07.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.07.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
18.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
08.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
09.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
28.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
10.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200703   M06   Fee paid on   15.10.2007
30.04.201107   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2011
30.04.201814   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2018
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5355429  (LEE NICHOLAS A ET AL) [X] 1-41,49-52,54-56 * column 5, lines 1-45 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 19 * * figures 5,6,10,11 * [A] 42-48,53;
 [XA]US5604836  (DUNPHY JAMES R ET AL) [X] 42,53 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 35 * * figure 1 * [A] 43-48;
 [DA]  - KANG H K ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF FIBRE OPTIC INGRESS/EGRESS METHODS FOR SMART COMPOSITE STRUCTURES", SMART MATERIALS AND STRUCTURES, IOP PUBLISHING LTD., BRISTOL, GB, (200004), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 0964-1726, pages 149 - 156, XP000920147 [DA] 1-56 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0964-1726/9/2/304