Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1746898

EP1746898 - IN-SHELL PASTEURIZATION OF EGGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.05.2009
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CSIR
Scientia
0002 Pretoria / ZA
[2007/05]
Inventor(s)01 / ERASMUS, Corinda
141/RE Johan Street,Raslouw
0149 CENTURION / ZA
02 / ROSSOUW, Mathys Johannes
PO Box 74500
Lynnwood Ridge 0040 / ZA
 [2007/29]
Former [2007/05]01 / ERASMUS, Corinda
141/RE Johan Street,Raslouw
0149 CENTURION / ZA
02 / ROSSOUW, Mathys Johannes
Plot 18, Elandshoek
1000 CULLINAN / ZA
Representative(s)Russell, Tim , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/05]Russell, Tim , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
GB-London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date05732307.322.04.2005
[2007/05]
WO2005IB01079
Priority number, dateZA2004000308522.04.2004         Original published format: ZA 200403085
[2007/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005102064
Date:03.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1746898
Date:31.01.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005
[2007/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1746898
Date:09.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:A23B5/005, A23L1/32
[2007/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/05]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PASTEURISIERUNG VON EIERN IN DER SCHALE[2007/05]
English:IN-SHELL PASTEURIZATION OF EGGS[2007/05]
French:PASTEURISATION D'OEUFS DANS LEUR COQUILLE[2007/05]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2006National basic fee paid 
16.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/05]
20.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2008Fee for grant paid
13.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)14.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
16.05.2008Request for further processing filed
16.05.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.06.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.07.2008
CY09.07.2008
CZ09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
EE09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
LT09.07.2008
RO09.07.2008
SI09.07.2008
SK09.07.2008
TR09.07.2008
BG09.10.2008
SE09.10.2008
GR10.10.2008
IS09.11.2008
PT09.12.2008
HU10.01.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/32]AT09.07.2008
CZ09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
EE09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
LT09.07.2008
RO09.07.2008
SI09.07.2008
SK09.07.2008
BG09.10.2008
SE09.10.2008
GR10.10.2008
IS09.11.2008
PT09.12.2008
HU10.01.2009
Former [2011/01]AT09.07.2008
CZ09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
EE09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
LT09.07.2008
RO09.07.2008
SI09.07.2008
SK09.07.2008
BG09.10.2008
SE09.10.2008
GR10.10.2008
IS09.11.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2010/12]AT09.07.2008
CZ09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
EE09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
LT09.07.2008
RO09.07.2008
SI09.07.2008
SK09.07.2008
BG09.10.2008
SE09.10.2008
IS09.11.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/27]AT09.07.2008
CZ09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
EE09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
LT09.07.2008
RO09.07.2008
SI09.07.2008
SK09.07.2008
BG09.10.2008
IS09.11.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/22]AT09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
EE09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
LT09.07.2008
SI09.07.2008
BG09.10.2008
IS09.11.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/20]AT09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
LT09.07.2008
SI09.07.2008
BG09.10.2008
IS09.11.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/16]AT09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
LT09.07.2008
SI09.07.2008
BG09.10.2008
IS09.11.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/10]LT09.07.2008
IS09.11.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9702751  (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 1-18 * example 7; claims 1,9,10 *;
 [A]WO03024249  (PASTEURIZATION TECHNOLOGIES LC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * claims 1,11-13,23 *;
 [A]WO9933360  (POLSTER LOUIS S [US]) [A] 1-18