Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1732548

EP1732548 - METHODS OF USING SUSTAINED RELEASE AMINOPYRIDINE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.05.2011
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Acorda Therapeutics, Inc.
420 Saw Mill River Road
Ardsley, NY 10502 / US
[2013/11]
Former [2006/51]For all designated states
Acorda Therapeutics, Inc.
15 Skyline Drive
Hawthorne NY 10531 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BLIGHT, Andrew, R.
10 Oskar Drive
Mahopac, NY 10541 / US
02 / MARINUCCI, Lawrence
25 Bank Street Apartment 214H
White Plains, NY 10606 / US
03 / COHEN, Ron
246 Harriman Road
Irvington, NY 10533 / US
 [2006/51]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/19]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/48]Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire , et al
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2006/51]Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire , et al
Murgitroyd and Company, 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date05732613.411.04.2005
[2006/51]
WO2005US12427
Priority number, dateUS20040560894P09.04.2004         Original published format: US 560894 P
US2005010255908.04.2005         Original published format: US 102559
[2006/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005099701
Date:27.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1732548
Date:20.12.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005
[2006/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1732548
Date:08.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/23]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1732548
Date:21.03.2012
[2012/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.03.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/44
[2006/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/51]
Extension statesAL09.10.2006
BA09.10.2006
HR09.10.2006
LV09.10.2006
MK09.10.2006
YU09.10.2006
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON AMINOPYRIN-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG[2010/45]
English:METHODS OF USING SUSTAINED RELEASE AMINOPYRIDINE COMPOSITIONS[2006/51]
French:UTILISATION DE COMPOSITIONS D'AMINOPYRIDINE A LIBERATION SOUTENUE[2006/51]
Former [2006/51]VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON AMINOPYRIN-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG
Entry into regional phase09.10.2006National basic fee paid 
09.10.2006Search fee paid 
09.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/51]
27.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2011Fee for grant paid
17.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11160247.0  / EP2377536
EP11168901.4  / EP2422782
EP11179067.1  / EP2460521
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.08.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.03.2012  14.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 02  08.03.2012  23.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
neuraxpharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Elisabeth-Selbert-Str. 23
40764 Langenfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Königer, Karsten, et al
Harmsen Utescher
Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Neuer Wall 80
20354 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/22]
Opponent(s)01  07.03.2012  14.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
 02  08.03.2012  23.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
neuraxpharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Elisabeth-Selbert-Str. 23
40764 Langenfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Königer, Karsten, et al
Harmsen Utescher
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Neuer Wall 80
D-20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2012/16]
Opponent(s)01  07.03.2012  14.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
 02  08.03.2012    ADMISSIBLE
neuraxpharm Arzneimittel GmbH & Co. KG
Elisabeth-Selbert-Strasse 23
40764 Langenfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Königer, Karsten
Harmsen Utescher
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Neuer Wall 80
D-20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2012/15]
Opponent(s)01  07.03.2012    ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
16.04.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.01.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.12.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition27.02.2014Appeal received No.  T0421/14
29.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
17.02.2014Appeal received No.  T0421/14
28.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
02.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]IE82916  (ELAN CORP PLC) [X] 1-19 * claim 1 *
 [X]  - BEVER C T, "THE CURRENT STATUS OF STUDIES OF AMINOPYRIDINES IN PATIENTS WITH MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS", ANNALS OF NEUROLOGY, BOSTON, US, (19940101), vol. 36, ISSN 0364-5134, pages S118 - S121, XP000653261 [X] 1-19 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.410360728
 [X]  - BEVER C T JR ET AL, "The effects of 4-aminopyridine in multiple sclerosis patients: Results of a randomized, placebo-controlled, double-blind, concentration-controlled, crossover trial", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (19940601), vol. 44, no. 6, ISSN 0028-3878, pages 1054 - 1059, XP009115521 [X] 1-19 * see "Treatment" *
 [X]  - SCHWID S R ET AL, "Quantitative assessment of sustained-release 4-aminopyridine for symptomatic treatment of multiple sclerosis", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (19970401), vol. 48, no. 4, ISSN 0028-3878, pages 817 - 821, XP009115522 [X] 1-19 * see "Procedure". *
 [X]  - VAN DIEMEN H A M ET AL, "THE EFFECT OF 4 AMINOPYRIDINE ON CLINICAL SIGNS IN MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS A RANDOMIZED PLACEBO-CONTROLLED DOUBLE-BLIND CROSS-OVER STUDY", ANNALS OF NEUROLOGY, (1992), vol. 32, no. 2, ISSN 0364-5134, pages 123 - 130, XP002524401 [X] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.410320203
International search[X]EP0484186  (ELAN CORP PLC [IE]);
 [X]  - FUJIHARA ET AL, "The effects of 4-aminopyridine on motor evoked potentials in multiple sclerosis.", JOURNAL OF THE NEUROLOGICAL SCIENCES., (1988), vol. 159, pages 102 - 106, XP001151991

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-510X(98)00143-9
otherEP2377536
 US8663685
 US8007826
    - GOODMAN ANDREW D ET AL, "Placebo-controlled double-blinded dose ranging study of fampridine-SR in multiple sclerosis", NEUROLOGY, vol. 60, no. 5 Supp, (20030311), XP009154279
    - "Final Program, Abstract Listing and Meeting Information", ACTRIMS-ECTRIMS 2002, (20020918), XP055502446
    - Goodman A. D. ET AL, "P 308: PLACEBO-CONTROLLED DOUBLE-BLINDED DOSE RANGING STUDY OF FAMPRIDINE-SR IN MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS", Multiple Sclerosis, (20020000), pages S116 - S117, XP055502452