blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1742726

EP1742726 - METHOD FOR DISPERSING AND PASSIVATING PARTICULATE POWDERS IN WATER AND AQUEOUS MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
For all designated states
Ceratizit S.A.
Route de Holzem B.P. 51
8201 Mamer / LU
For all designated states
Gühring OHG
Herderstrasse 50-54
72458 Albstadt / DE
For all designated states
Kennametal Widia GmbH & Co. KG
Münchener Strasse 125-127
45145 Essen / DE
For all designated states
Kennametal GmbH & Co. KG, Werkzeuge + Hartstoffe
Wehlauer Strasse 73
90766 Fürth / DE
For all designated states
H.C. Starck GmbH
Im Schleeke 78-91
38642 Goslar / DE
For all designated states
Wolfram Bergbau-und Hütten-GmbH Nfg.KG
Bergla 33
8543 St-Martin i. S. / AT
For all designated states
G. U. S. Beteiligungs GmbH
Püttlingerstrasse 123
66773 Schwalbach/Sarr / DE
For all designated states
Hartmetall AG
Industriestrasse 13
6285 Hitzkirch / CH
[N/P]
Former [2011/06]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
For all designated states
Ceratizit S.A.
Route de Holzem B.P. 51
8201 Mamer / LU
For all designated states
Gühring OHG
Herderstrasse 50-54
72458 Albstadt / DE
For all designated states
Kennametal Widia GmbH & Co. KG
Münchener Strasse 125-127
45145 Essen / DE
For all designated states
Kennametal GmbH & Co. KG, Werkzeuge + Hartstoffe
Wehlauer Strasse 73
90766 Fürth / DE
For all designated states
H.C. Starck GmbH
Im Schleeke 78-91
38642 Goslar / DE
For all designated states
Wolfram Bergbau-und Hütten-GmbH Nfg.KG
Bergla 33
8543 St-Martin i. S. / AT
For all designated states
G. U. S. Beteiligungs GmbH
Püttlingerstrasse 123
66773 Schwalbach/Sarr / DE
For all designated states
Hartmetall AG
Industriestrasse 13
6285 Hitzkirch / CH
Former [2009/51]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
For all designated states
Ceratizit S.A.
Route de Holzem B.P. 51
8201 Mamer / LU
For all designated states
Gühring OHG
Herderstrasse 50-54
72458 Albstadt / DE
For all designated states
Kennametal Widia GmbH & Co. KG
Münchener Strasse 125-127
45145 Essen / DE
For all designated states
Kennametal GmbH & Co. KG, Werkzeuge + Hartstoffe
Wehlauer Strasse 73
90766 Fürth / DE
For all designated states
H.C. Starck GmbH
Im Schleeke 78-91
38642 Goslar / DE
For all designated states
Wolfram Bergbau-und Hütten-GmbH Nfg.KG
Bergla 33
8543 St-Martin i. S. / AU
For all designated states
G. U. S. Beteiligungs GmbH
Püttlingerstrasse 123
66773 Schwalbach/Sarr / DE
For all designated states
Hartmetall AG
Industriestrasse 13
6285 Hitzkirch / CH
Former [2007/03]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
For all designated states
Ceratizit S.A.
Route de Holzem B.P. 51
8201 Mamer / LU
For all designated states
Gühring OHG
Herderstrasse 50-54
72458 Albstadt / DE
For all designated states
Kennametal Widia GmbH & Co. KG
Münchener Strasse 125-127
45145 Essen / DE
For all designated states
Kennametal GmbH & Co. KG, Werkzeuge + Hartstoffe
Wehlauer Strasse 73
90766 Fürth / DE
For all designated states
H.C. Starck GmbH
Im Schleeke 78-91
38642 Goslar / DE
For all designated states
Wolfram Bergbau-und Hütten-GmbH Nfg.KG
Bergla 33
8543 St-Martin i. S. / AU
For all designated states
G. U. S. Beteiligungs GmbH
Püttlingerstrasse 123
66773 Schwalbach/Sarr / DE
For all designated states
Hartmetall AG
Industriestrasse 13
6285 Hitzkirch / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BODEN, Gottfried
Reisstrasse 64
01257 Dresden / DE
02 / THIELE, Sven
Saubachweg 1
09599 Freiberg / DE
03 / NEBELUNG, Manfred
Prellerstrasse 4
01309 Dresden / DE
 [2007/03]
Application number, filing date05732731.413.04.2005
[2007/03]
WO2005EP03886
Priority number, dateDE2004102055927.04.2004         Original published format: DE102004020559
[2007/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005107934
Date:17.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1742726
Date:17.01.2007
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1742726
Date:09.02.2011
Language:DE
[2011/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.11.2005
ClassificationIPC:B01F17/00, B01F17/16
[2007/03]
CPC:
C09K23/16 (EP,US); C09K23/00 (KR); B22F1/09 (EP,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/03]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DISPERGIERUNG UND PASSIVIERUNG VON FEINTEILIGEN PULVERN IN WASSER UND WÄSSRIGEN MEDIEN[2007/03]
English:METHOD FOR DISPERSING AND PASSIVATING PARTICULATE POWDERS IN WATER AND AQUEOUS MEDIA[2007/03]
French:PROCEDE POUR DISPERSER ET PASSIVER DES POUDRES A FINES PARTICULES DANS DE L'EAU ET DANS DES MILIEUX AQUEUX[2007/03]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2006National basic fee paid 
24.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/03]
01.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2010Fee for grant paid
16.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
HU09.02.2011
IS09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BE30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/33]CY09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IS09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BE30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2012/09]CY09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BE30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/51]CY09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/47]CY09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/37]CY09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/36]LT09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
GR10.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[PX]JP2005048122  ;
 [A]DE4212514  (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, lines 3-5 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 25 * * column 4, lines 11-36 *;
 [X]DE19846096  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, lines 21-36 * * page 4, lines 6,52 * * page 5, lines 22-28; example 1 *;
 [A]WO0121298  (AVECIA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 1, lines 1-3 * * page 3, lines 13-18 * * page 9, line 37 - page 10, line 14 ** page 10, lines 31-38 *;
 [PX]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 21, Database accession no. 2005-199663, XP002332301 & JP2005048122 A 20050224 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [PX] 1 * abstract *
by applicantWO9321127
 DE4336694
 EP0771316
 WO9800256
 DE19751355
 DE19800310
 DE19846096
 EP1153652
 DE10130161
 JP2005048122
    - "WPI", Database accession no. 2005-199663
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.