Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1756280

EP1756280 - SYNTHESIS OF LONG-CHAIN POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS BY RECOMBINANT CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.10.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 29.11.2017  [2017/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Black Mountain Science and Innovation Park
Clunies Ross Street
Acton ACT 2601 / AU
[2016/33]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU
Former [2009/02]For all designated states
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU
Former [2007/09]For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / SINGH, Surinder, Pal
10 Lucas Place
Downer, ACT 2602 / AU
02 / ROBERT, Stanley, Suresh
66 Manuka Road
Oyster Cove, TAS 7150 / AU
03 / BLACKBURN, Susan, Irene, Ellis
1 Trumpeter Street
Battery Point, TAS 7004 / AU
04 / ZHOU, Xue-Rong
53 Heydon Crescent
Evatt, ACT 2617 / AU
05 / PETRIE, James, Robertson
190 Newington Road
Bywong New South Wales 2621 / AU
06 / GREEN, Allan, Graham
6-53 Elimatta Street
Braddon, ACT 2612 / AU
07 / NICHOLS, Peter, David
14 Gourlay Street
West Hobart TAS 7000 / AU
 [2014/35]
Former [2007/09]01 / SINGH, Surinder, Pal
10 Lucas Place
Downer, ACT 2602 / AU
02 / ROBERT, Stanley, Suresh
66 Manuka Road
Oyster Cove, TAS 7150 / AU
03 / BLACKBURN, Susan, Irene, Ellis
1 Trumpeter Street
Battery Point, TAS 7004 / AU
04 / ZHOU, Xue-Rong
53 Heydon Crescent
Evatt, ACT 2617 / AU
05 / PETRIE, James, Robertson
6-53 Elimatta Street
Braddon, ACT 2612 / AU
06 / GREEN, Allan, Graham
6-53 Elimatta Street
Braddon, ACT 2612 / AU
Representative(s)Almond-Martin, Carol , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2013/28]
Former [2007/09]Almond-Martin, Carol , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date05733657.022.04.2005
[2007/09]
WO2005AU00571
Priority number, dateUS20040564627P22.04.2004         Original published format: US 564627 P
US20040613861P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613861 P
AU2005090167305.04.2005         Original published format: AU 2005901673
US20050668705P05.04.2005         Original published format: US 668705 P
[2007/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005103253
Date:03.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1756280
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005
[2007/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1756280
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU03.11.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/82, C12N15/53, C11B1/00, A01H5/10
[2008/17]
Former International [2007/09]C12N15/11, A01H5/00, C11B1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/09]
TitleGerman:SYNTHESE LANGKETTIGER MEHRFACH UNGESÄTTIGTER FETTSÄUREN DURCH REKOMBINANTE ZELLEN[2007/09]
English:SYNTHESIS OF LONG-CHAIN POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS BY RECOMBINANT CELLS[2007/09]
French:SYNTHESE D'ACIDES GRAS POLYINSATURES A CHAINE LONGUE PAR DES CELLULES DE RECOMBINAISON[2007/09]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2006National basic fee paid 
21.11.2006Search fee paid 
21.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/09]
15.01.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
22.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2014Fee for grant paid
01.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP11155266.7  / EP2363492
EP11155282.4  / EP2357243
EP11155364.0  / EP2357244
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.02.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.08.2015  10.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/24]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.2015  10.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2016/40]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.2015  10.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
Former [2015/38]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.2015   
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Dick, Alexander
Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstraße 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
17.09.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.03.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.09.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.02.2017
15.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
09.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.04.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition19.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1429/17
23.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
23.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1429/17
22.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.11.2014
BE12.11.2014
BG12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
IE22.04.2015
LU22.04.2015
[2017/48]
Former [2017/39]AT12.11.2014
BG12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
IE22.04.2015
LU22.04.2015
Former [2016/20]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
IE22.04.2015
LU22.04.2015
Former [2016/12]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
LU22.04.2015
Former [2016/01]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
LU22.04.2015
Former [2015/52]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
LU22.04.2015
Former [2015/35]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/26]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/25]AT12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/24]FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/23]FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/22]LT12.11.2014
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/20]LT12.11.2014
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2005083093  (BASF PLANT SCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,28-34 * examples 5,16,21,25,30,35,40,45,54,58-61 *
 [X]  - ABBADI A ET AL, "Transgenic oilseeds as sustainable source of nutritionally relevant C20 and C22 polyunsaturated fatty acids?", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF LIPID SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (200102), vol. 103, no. 2, ISSN 1438-7697, pages 106 - 113, XP002228744 [X] 1,28-34 * page 109 - page 111; figure 1; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1438-9312(200102)103:2<106::AID-EJLT106>3.0.CO;2-V
 [X]  - WOLFF R L ET AL, "ARACHIDONIC, EICOSAPENTAENOIC, AND BIOSYNTHETICALLY RELATED FATTY ACIDS IN THE SEED LIPIDS FROM A PRIMITIVE GYMNOSPERM, AGATHIS ROBUSTA", LIPIDS, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, (1999), vol. 34, no. 10, ISSN 0024-4201, pages 1083 - 1097, XP001015626 [X] 1,28-34 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11745-999-0460-y
 [X]  - HASTINGS NICOLA ET AL, "A vertebrate fatty acid desaturase with DELTA5 and DELTA6 activities", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20011204), vol. 98, no. 25, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14304 - 14309, XP002473013 [X] 1,28-34 * abstract * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.251516598
    [ ] - "Danio rerio putative delta-6 fatty acyl desaturase (Fadsd6) mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20001025), Database accession no. AF309556, URL: EBI
 [X]  - SAYANOVA O V ET AL, "Eicosapentaenoic acid: biosynthetic routes and the potential for synthesis in transgenic plants", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (200401), vol. 65, no. 2, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 147 - 158, XP004483374 [X] 1,28-34 * page 154 - page 155 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.phytochem.2003.10.017
International search[X]WO9846764  (CALGENE LLC [US], et al);
 [X]US2002170090  (BROWSE JOHN A [US], et al);
 [X]WO0042195  (CALGENE LLC [US]);
 [X]WO9949050  (DU PONT [US], et al);
 [X]WO9855625  (CALGENE LLC [US]);
 [XP]WO2004057001  (UNIV BRISTOL [GB], et al);
 [XP]WO2004071467  (DU PONT [US], et al);
 [XP]WO2005012316  (BASF PLANT SCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al)
 [X]  - DOMERGUE F. ET AL, "Acyl Carriers Used as Substrates by the Desaturases and Elongases Involved in Very Long-chain Polyunsaturated Fatty Acids Biosynthesis Reconstituted in Yeast.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., (2003), vol. 278, no. 37, pages 35115 - 35126, XP002313880

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M305990200
by applicantWO0042195
 US4945050
 US5141131
 US5177010
 US5104310
 US5004863
 US5159135
 WO8706614
 US5472869
 US5384253
 WO9209696
 WO9321335
 US5608152
 WO9845461
 US5504200
 WO9113980
 WO9515389
 WO9523230
 WO9916890
 US2003159173
 US4666701
 US4758592
 US5116871
 WO03078639
    - Essential Molecular Biology: A Practical Approach, IRL PRESS, (1991), vol. 1, 2
    - DNA Cloning: A Practical Approach, IRL PRESS, (1995), vol. 1-4
    - Current Protocols in Immunology, JOHN WILEY & SONS
    - "Dinoflagellates", HASLE, G. R.; SYVERTSEN, E. E., Identifying Marine Phytoplankton, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1996), pages 531 - 532
    - "The oceanic cyanobacterial picoplankton", CARR, N.G.; N. H. MANN, Molecular biology of cyanobacteria, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1994), pages 27 - 48
    - ABBADI, A. ET AL., EUR. J. LIPID. SCI. TECHNOL., (2001), vol. 103, pages 106 - 113
    - ABBADI, A. ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2004), vol. 16, pages 2734 - 2748
    - ABBOTT ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, pages 2012 - 2018
    - AGABA, M. ET AL., MARINE BIOTECHNOL (NY, (2004), vol. 6, pages 251 - 261
    - AKIYAMA, H. ET AL., DNA RES., (1998), vol. 5, pages 327 - 334
    - AKIYAMA, H. ET AL., DNA RES., (1998), vol. 5, pages 127 - 129
    - BAUMLEIN, H. ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1991), vol. 225, pages 459 - 467
    - BAUMLEIN, H. ET AL., PLANT J., (1992), vol. 2, pages 233 - 239
    - BEAUDOIN, F. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI U.S.A., (2000), vol. 97, pages 6421 - 6426
    - BERBERICH, T. ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 36, pages 297 - 306
    - BOLCH, C.J. ET AL., J. PHYCOLOGY, (1999), vol. 35, pages 339 - 355
    - BOLCH, C.J. ET AL., J. PHYCOLOGY, (1999), vol. 35, pages 356 - 367
    - BROUN, P. ET AL., PLANT J., (1998), vol. 13, pages 201 - 210
    - BROWN, M.R. ET AL., AQUACULTURE, (1997), vol. 151, pages 315 - 331
    - BROWSE, J.A.; SLACK, C.R., FEBS LETTERS, (1981), vol. 131, pages 111 - 114
    - CHINAIN, M. ET AL., J. PHYCOLOGY, (1997), vol. 33, pages 36 - 43
    - CHO, H.P. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 471 - 477
    - CHO, H.P. ET AL., J. BIOL CHEM, (1999), vol. 274, pages 37335 - 37339
    - CLOUGH, S.J.; BENT, A.F., PLANT J., (1998), vol. 16, pages 735 - 43
    - COLEMAN, A.W., AM. J. BOT., (1977), vol. 64, pages 361 - 368
    - DOMERGUE, F. ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (2002), vol. 269, pages 4105 - 4113
    - DOMERGUE, F. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 35115 - 35126
    - DOMERGUE, F. ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2003), vol. 131, pages 1648 - 1660
    - DREXLER, H. ET AL., J. PLANT PHYSIOL., (2003), vol. 160, pages 779 - 802
    - DUNSTAN, G. A. ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 35, pages 155 - 161
    - GALLAGHER, J.C., J. PHYCOLOGY, (1980), vol. 16, pages 464 - 474
    - GARCIA-MAROTO, F. ET AL., LIPIDS, (2002), vol. 37, pages 417 - 426
    - GIRKE, T. ET AL., PLANT J., (1998), vol. 15, pages 39 - 48
    - GUIL-GUERRERO, J.L. ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 53, pages 451 - 456
    - HASELOFF, J.; GERLACH, W.L., NATURE, (1988), vol. 334, pages 585 - 591
    - HASTINGS, N. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2001), vol. 98, pages 14304 - 14309
    - HONG, H. ET AL., LIPIDS, (2002), vol. 37, pages 863 - 868
    - HORIGUCHI, G. ET AL., PLANT CELL PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 39, pages 540 - 544
    - HUANG, Y.S. ET AL., LIPIDS, (1999), vol. 34, pages 649 - 659
    - IKEDA, K. ET AL., WORLD J. MICROBIOL. BIOTECH., (2002), vol. 18, pages 55 - 56
    - INAGAKI, K. ET AL., BIOSCI BIOTECHNOL BIOCHEM, (2002), vol. 66, pages 613 - 621
    - JONES, A.V.; HARWOOD, J.L, BIOCHEM J., (1980), vol. 190, pages 851 - 854
    - KAJIKAWA, M. ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (2004), vol. 54, pages 335 - 52
    - KNUTZON, D.S. ET AL., J. BIOL CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 29360 - 6
    - LEE, M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 280, pages 915 - 918
    - LEONARD, A.E. ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2000), vol. 347, pages 719 - 724
    - LEONARD, A.E. ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2000), vol. 350, pages 765 - 770
    - LEONARD, A.E. ET AL., LIPIDS, (2002), vol. 37, pages 733 - 740
    - LO, J. ET AL., GENOME RES., (2003), vol. 13, pages 455 - 466
    - MANSOUR, M.P. ET AL., J. PHYCOL., (1999), vol. 35, pages 710 - 720
    - MEDLIN, L.K. ET AL., J. MARINE SYSTEMS, (1996), vol. 9, pages 13 - 31
    - METZ, J.G. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, pages 290 - 293
    - MEYER, A. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 42, pages 9779 - 9788
    - MEYER, A. ET AL., LIPID RES, (2004), vol. 45, pages 1899 - 1909
    - MICHAELSON, L.V. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 19055 - 19059
    - MICHAELSON, L. V. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1998), vol. 439, pages 215 - 218
    - MITCHELL, A.G.; MARTIN, C.E., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 29766 - 29772
    - MORITA, N. ET AL., BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (2000), vol. 28, pages 872 - 879
    - NAPIER, J.A. ET AL., BIOCHEM J., (1998), vol. 330, pages 611 - 614
    - NAPIER, J.A ET AL., TRENDS IN PLANT SCI, (1999), vol. 4, pages 2 - 4
    - NAPIER, J.A. ET AL., CURR. OP. PLANT BIOL., (1999), vol. 2, pages 123 - 127
    - NEEDLEMAN, S.B.; WUNSCH, C.D., J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453
    - PARKER-BARNES, J.F. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 8284 - 8289
    - PEREIRA, S.L. ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2004), vol. 378, pages 665 - 671
    - PERRIMAN, R. ET AL., GENE, (1992), vol. 113, pages 157 - 163
    - QI, B. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (2002), vol. 510, pages 159 - 165
    - QIU, X. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 31561 - 31566
    - REDDY, A.S. ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 22, pages 293 - 300
    - SAITO, T. ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 267, pages 1813 - 1818
    - SAKURADANI, E. ET AL., GENE, (1999), vol. 238, pages 445 - 453
    - SAYANOVA, O.V. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1997), vol. 94, pages 4211 - 4216
    - SAYANOVA, O.V. ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1999), vol. 121, pages 641 - 646
    - SAYANOVA, O.V. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (2003), vol. 542, pages 100 - 104
    - SAYANOVA, O.V.; NAPIER, J.A., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 65, pages 147 - 158
    - SHIPPY, R. ET AL., MOL. BIOTECH., (1999), vol. 12, pages 117 - 129
    - SIMOPOULOS, A.P., POULTRY SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 79, pages 961 - 970
    - SINGH, S. ET AL., PLANTA, (2001), vol. 212, pages 872 - 879
    - SMITH, N.A. ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 407, pages 319 - 320
    - SPERLING, P. ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 267, pages 3801 - 3811
    - SPERLING, P.; HEINZ, E., EUR. J. LIPID SCI. TECHNOL, (2001), vol. 103, pages 158 - 180
    - SPRECHER, H. ET AL., J. LIPID RES., (1995), vol. 36, pages 2471 - 2477
    - SPYCHALLA, P.J. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1997), vol. 94, pages 1142 - 1147
    - STALBERG, K. ET AL., PLANT. MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 23, pages 671 - 683
    - TAKEYAMA, H. ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 143, pages 2725 - 2731
    - TANAKA, M. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. LETT., (1999), vol. 21, pages 939 - 945
    - TONON, T. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (2003), vol. 553, pages 440 - 444
    - TRAUTWEIN, E.A., EUR. J. LIPID SCI. TECHNOL., (2001), vol. 103, pages 45 - 55
    - TVRDIK, P., J. CELL BIOL., (2000), vol. 149, pages 707 - 718
    - VALVEKENS, D. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1988), vol. 85, pages 5536 - 5540
    - VOLKMAN, J.K. ET AL., J. EXP. MAR. BIOL. ECOL., (1989), vol. 128, pages 219 - 240
    - WALLIS, J.G.; BROWSE, J., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS, (1999), vol. 365, pages 307 - 316
    - WANG, M.B. ET AL., J. GEN. BREED., (1997), vol. 51, pages 325 - 334
    - WATERBURY, J. B. ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1988), vol. 167, pages 100 - 105
    - WATERHOUSE, P.M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 13959 - 13964
    - WATTS, J.L.; BROWSE, J., ARCH BIOCHEM BIOPHYS, (1999), vol. 362, pages 175 - 182
    - WILLIAMS, J.G.; SZALAY, A.A., GENE, (1983), vol. 24, no. 37-51
    - WHITNEY, H.M. ET AL., PLANTA, (2003), vol. 217, pages 983 - 992
    - YAZAWA, K., LIPIDS, (1996), vol. 31, pages 5297 - 5300
    - YU, R. ET AL., LIPIDS, (2000), vol. 35, pages 1061 - 1064
    - ZANK, T.K. ET AL., PLANT J., (2000), vol. 31, pages 255 - 268
    - ZANK, T.K. ET AL., PLANT J., (2002), vol. 31, pages 255 - 268
    - ZHANG, Q. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (2004), vol. 556, pages 81 - 85
    - ZHOU, X.R.; CHRISTIE, P.J., J BACTERIOL, (1997), vol. 179, pages 5835 - 5842