blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1746909 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1746909



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1459
24.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.10.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
19.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.10.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 23
13.10.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
14.09.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
11.09.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
23.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
17.08.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
17.08.2017 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
17.08.2017 Non-scannable object Appeal 7
19.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.04.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
04.04.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
30.03.2017 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
29.03.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 14
24.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 4
16.03.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.09.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
08.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.09.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
03.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.09.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
28.02.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.02.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 33
11.12.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
05.12.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
04.12.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
11.11.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
18.09.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
21.08.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 3
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 15
14.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Claims Appeal 6
14.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 3
14.08.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
11.06.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
05.06.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
04.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.06.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.04.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
04.04.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
04.04.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
04.04.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 17
04.04.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.04.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.04.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
04.04.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.04.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 16
31.01.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
24.01.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.01.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.01.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
23.01.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.01.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.12.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 37
21.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.12.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 8
21.12.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 4
21.12.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
21.12.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
21.12.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
21.12.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.11.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
12.11.2012 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
06.11.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 7
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 7
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 19
01.10.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 4
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 4
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
01.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
01.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
28.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.09.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
27.09.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
27.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.04.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
20.04.2012 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
20.04.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Search / examination 3
20.04.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.04.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2012 Request for correction Search / examination 2
06.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.02.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
21.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.10.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.10.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.10.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.10.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.10.2011 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 17
10.09.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.08.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
02.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.04.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Search / examination 10
18.02.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.02.2011 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.12.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Search / examination 1
22.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.10.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.09.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.09.2010 Request for documents Opposition 1
09.09.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
09.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.09.2010 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.09.2010 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
09.09.2010 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.09.2010 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.09.2010 Non-scannable object Opposition 40
09.09.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 40
09.09.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.09.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.09.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.09.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
09.09.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.09.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
12.11.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.10.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.10.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.10.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
20.10.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 9
20.10.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.06.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.06.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.06.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.06.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
01.12.2008 Claims Search / examination 6
01.12.2008 Claims Search / examination 6
01.12.2008 Description Search / examination 29
01.12.2008 Drawings Search / examination 1
01.12.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.07.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.07.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.05.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.05.2008 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 2
23.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 6
23.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 5
23.05.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
23.05.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
14.01.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
14.01.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 7
04.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 5
04.10.2007 Description Search / examination 4
04.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
10.08.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.07.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.03.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
27.03.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.01.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
04.01.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.11.2006 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
12.10.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
12.10.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
12.10.2006 Description Search / examination 4
12.10.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
29.09.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.03.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
02.03.2006 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
12.12.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 59
24.11.2005 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 47
03.11.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
03.11.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
03.11.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
12.05.2005 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
12.05.2005 Claims International Searching Authority 8
12.05.2005 Description International Searching Authority 27
12.05.2005 Drawings International Searching Authority 10