blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1752828

EP1752828 - USE OF A RINSE SOLUTION IN LITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/07]RINSE SOLUTION FOR LITHOGRAPHY
[2014/11]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.12.2014
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.01.2015  [2015/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP
[2007/07]
Inventor(s)01 / KOSHIYAMA, Jun
c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
02 / WAKIYA, Kazumasa
c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
03 / KANEKO, Fumitake
c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
04 / MIYAMOTO, Atsushi
c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
05 / SAWADA, Yoshihiro
c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
06 / TAJIMA, Hidekazu
c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
 [2014/16]
Former [2007/07]01 / KOSHIYAMA, Jun, c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
02 / WAKIYA, Kazumasa, c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
03 / KANEKO, Fumitake, c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
04 / MIYAMOTO, Atsushi, c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
05 / SAWADA, Yoshihiro, c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
06 / TAJIMA, Hidekazu, c/o TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD.
150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2110012 / JP
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstraße 54
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Beetz & Partner
Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Former [2007/07]Beetz & Partner
Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05734583.720.04.2005
[2007/07]
WO2005JP07503
Priority number, dateJP2004012909523.04.2004         Original published format: JP 2004129095
JP2004025493901.09.2004         Original published format: JP 2004254939
JP2004034919701.12.2004         Original published format: JP 2004349197
[2007/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005103830
Date:03.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1752828
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.11.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2010
ClassificationIPC:G03F7/32, G03F7/40, H01L21/027
[2010/16]
CPC:
G03F7/322 (EP,US); G03F7/32 (EP,KR,US); G03F7/40 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2007/07]G03F7/32, H01L21/027
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2007/31]
Former [2007/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINER SPÜLLÖSUNG IN DER LITHOGRAPHIE[2014/11]
English:USE OF A RINSE SOLUTION IN LITHOGRAPHY[2014/11]
French:UTILISATION D'UNE SOLUTION DE RINÇAGE POUR LA LITHOGRAPHIE[2014/11]
Former [2007/07]SPÜLLÖSUNG FÜR DIE LITHOGRAPHIE
Former [2007/07]RINSE SOLUTION FOR LITHOGRAPHY
Former [2007/07]SOLUTION DE RINÇAGE POUR LITHOGRAPHIE
Entry into regional phase22.11.2006Translation filed 
23.11.2006National basic fee paid 
23.11.2006Search fee paid 
23.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/07]
03.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/04]
08.09.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2015/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
17.06.2010Request for further processing filed
17.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201410   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPH07142349  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [X]JPH11295902  (KAO CORP);
 [A]JPH07335519  (HITACHI LTD);
 [A]JPH05299336  (SOLTEC KK)
ExaminationUS5373052
 US5723680
 US6191188
by applicantJP2002148816
 JP2001023893
 JP2001159824
 JP2002323774
 JPH07142349
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.