Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1741110

EP1741110 - POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION USING METALLIC GLASS-COATED MICROWIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.04.2011  [2011/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Demodulation, Inc.
121 Goodwin Terrace
Westwoord, NJ 07675 / US
[2007/02]
Inventor(s)01 / GOLDSTEIN, Alan H.
P.O. Box 794, 5080 McAndrews Road
Alfred, NY 14802 / US
02 / LACOURSE, William C.
15 Reynolds Street
Alfred, NY 14802 / US
03 / LIEBERMANN, Howard H.
11 Cynthia Drive
Succasunna, NJ 07876 / US
 [2007/02]
Representative(s)Peel, James Peter
Barker Brettell LLP
First Floor, Atrium Court
15-17 Jockey's Fields
London
WC1R 4QR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/02]Peel, James Peter
Barker Brettell, 10-12 Priests Bridge
London SW15 5JE / GB
Application number, filing date05734606.605.04.2005
[2007/02]
WO2005US11697
Priority number, dateUS20040559995P06.04.2004         Original published format: US 559995 P
US2005009805204.04.2005         Original published format: US 98052
[2007/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005101464
Date:27.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1741110
Date:10.01.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005
[2007/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.01.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01B7/18, A61B13/00
[2007/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYMERASEKETTENREAKTION UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES METALLISCHEN GLASBESCHICHTETEN MIKRODRAHTS[2007/02]
English:POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION USING METALLIC GLASS-COATED MICROWIRE[2007/02]
French:REACTION EN CHAINE DE LA POLYMERASE FAISANT APPEL A UN MICROFIL ENROBE DE VERRE METALLIQUE[2007/02]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2006National basic fee paid 
23.10.2006Search fee paid 
23.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.10.2006Examination requested  [2007/02]
20.12.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/17]
10.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200905   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.2009
30.04.201006   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[T]  SPINELLI, PCR within powdered porous glass: Potential application for glass-coated amorphous metal microwires, NEW YORK, ALFRED UNIVERSITY, XP002509896 [T] 1-13 * the whole document, In particular part IV * downloaded from the internet on 12.1.2008 *
 [A]  ENKE D ET AL, "Porous glasses in the 21st century--a short review", MICROPOROUS AND MESOPOROUS MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, US, (20030619), vol. 60, no. 1-3, ISSN 1387-1811, pages 19 - 30, XP004430809 [A] 1-13 * part 2 and 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1387-1811(03)00329-9
International search[X]US6270591
 [Y]US6544193
 [A]US5240066