Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1759275

EP1759275 - CAPTURING TEXT FROM RENDERED DOCUMENTS USING SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.07.2011
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2011/22]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Former [2007/10]For all designated states
Exbiblio B.V.
Hemonystraat 11
1074 BK Amsterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KING, Martin, T.
17322 115th Ave. SW
Vashon Island, WA 98070 / US
02 / KUSHLER, Clifford, A.
20615 36th Place West
Lynnwood, WA 98036-5094 / US
03 / STAFFORD-FRASER, James Quentin
20 Marlowe Road
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 9JW / GB
04 / GROVER, Dale Lawrence
511 Little Lake Drive
Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US
 [2007/10]
Representative(s)Robinson, David Edward Ashdown , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/11]Schley, Jan Malte , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8
80807 München / DE
Former [2009/45]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2008/50]Brophy, David Timothy , et al
F.R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2007/10]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05734947.401.04.2005
[2007/10]
WO2005US11085
Priority number, dateUS20040558527P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558527 P
US20040559265P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 559265 P
US20040558893P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558893 P
US20040558499P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558499 P
US20040559279P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 559279 P
US20040558760P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558760 P
US20040558789P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558789 P
US20040558867P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558867 P
US20040558969P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558969 P
US20040558717P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558717 P
US20040558791P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558791 P
US20040559277P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 559277 P
US20040559278P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 559278 P
US20040559226P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 559226 P
US20040558370P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558370 P
US20040558968P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558968 P
US20040558892P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558892 P
US20040559125P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 559125 P
US20040559087P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 559087 P
US20040559033P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 559033 P
US20040559127P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 559127 P
US20040559131P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 559131 P
US20040558909P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 558909 P
US20040559766P06.04.2004         Original published format: US 559766 P
US20040561768P12.04.2004         Original published format: US 561768 P
US20040563520P19.04.2004         Original published format: US 563520 P
US20040563485P19.04.2004         Original published format: US 563485 P
US20040564846P23.04.2004         Original published format: US 564846 P
US20040564688P23.04.2004         Original published format: US 564688 P
US20040566667P30.04.2004         Original published format: US 566667 P
US20040571381P14.05.2004         Original published format: US 571381 P
US20040571560P14.05.2004         Original published format: US 571560 P
US20040571715P17.05.2004         Original published format: US 571715 P
US20040589203P19.07.2004         Original published format: US 589203 P
US20040589201P19.07.2004         Original published format: US 589201 P
US20040589202P19.07.2004         Original published format: US 589202 P
US20040598821P02.08.2004         Original published format: US 598821 P
US20040602956P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602956 P
US20040602897P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602897 P
US20040602925P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602925 P
US20040602930P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602930 P
US20040602896P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602896 P
US20040602947P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602947 P
US20040602898P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602898 P
US20040603466P19.08.2004         Original published format: US 603466 P
US20040603082P19.08.2004         Original published format: US 603082 P
US20040603081P19.08.2004         Original published format: US 603081 P
US20040603498P20.08.2004         Original published format: US 603498 P
US20040603358P20.08.2004         Original published format: US 603358 P
US20040604103P23.08.2004         Original published format: US 604103 P
US20040604100P23.08.2004         Original published format: US 604100 P
US20040604102P23.08.2004         Original published format: US 604102 P
US20040604098P23.08.2004         Original published format: US 604098 P
US20040605105P27.08.2004         Original published format: US 605105 P
US20040605229P27.08.2004         Original published format: US 605229 P
US20040613589P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613589 P
US20040613454P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613454 P
US20040613634P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613634 P
US20040613400P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613400 P
US20040613633P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613633 P
US20040613455P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613455 P
US20040613341P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613341 P
US20040613602P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613602 P
US20040613460P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613460 P
US20040613361P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613361 P
US20040613461P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613461 P
US20040613339P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613339 P
US20040613456P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613456 P
US20040613242P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613242 P
US20040613340P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613340 P
US20040613628P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613628 P
US20040613243P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613243 P
US20040613632P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613632 P
US20040615378P01.10.2004         Original published format: US 615378 P
US20040615112P01.10.2004         Original published format: US 615112 P
US20040615538P01.10.2004         Original published format: US 615538 P
US20040617122P07.10.2004         Original published format: US 617122 P
US20040622906P28.10.2004         Original published format: US 622906 P
US2004000463703.12.2004         Original published format: US 4637
US20040633453P06.12.2004         Original published format: US 633453 P
US20040633678P06.12.2004         Original published format: US 633678 P
US20040633452P06.12.2004         Original published format: US 633452 P
US20040633486P06.12.2004         Original published format: US 633486 P
US20040634739P09.12.2004         Original published format: US 634739 P
US20040634627P09.12.2004         Original published format: US 634627 P
US20050647684P26.01.2005         Original published format: US 647684 P
US20050648746P31.01.2005         Original published format: US 648746 P
US20050653372P15.02.2005         Original published format: US 653372 P
US20050653679P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653679 P
US20050653669P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653669 P
US20050653847P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653847 P
US20050653663P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653663 P
US20050653899P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653899 P
US20050654379P17.02.2005         Original published format: US 654379 P
US20050654326P18.02.2005         Original published format: US 654326 P
US20050654196P18.02.2005         Original published format: US 654196 P
US20050654368P18.02.2005         Original published format: US 654368 P
US20050655697P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655697 P
US20050655280P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655280 P
US20050655281P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655281 P
US20050655279P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655279 P
US20050655987P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655987 P
US20050657309P28.02.2005         Original published format: US 657309 P
[2007/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005098605
Date:20.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1759275
Date:07.03.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005
[2007/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.01.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06F17/30
[2009/19]
Former International [2007/12]G06K9/00
Former International [2007/10]G06F7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TEXTERFASSUNG AUS WIEDERGEGEBENEN DOKUMENTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ERGÄNZUNGSINFORMATIONEN[2007/10]
English:CAPTURING TEXT FROM RENDERED DOCUMENTS USING SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION[2007/10]
French:CAPTURE DE TEXTE A PARTIR DE DOCUMENTS IMPRIMES OU AFFICHES A L'AIDE D'INFORMATIONS SUPPLEMENTAIRES[2007/10]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2006National basic fee paid 
31.10.2006Search fee paid 
31.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2006Examination requested  [2007/31]
04.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2016
10.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination02.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0934/17
28.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.12.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.09.2010Request for further processing filed
30.09.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.10.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201006   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.2010
30.04.201612   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2366033  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-46 * page 4, line 10 - page 7, line 6 * * page 9, line 25 - page 17, line 20 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2003152293  (BRESLER JOEL [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * page 1, paragraph 11 - page 2, paragraph 20 * * page 2, paragraph 33 - paragraph 38 * * page 3, paragraph 68 - page 12, paragraph 233 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP1054335  (DIGIMARC CORP [US]) [X] 1-46 * page 5, line 10 - page 59, line 9 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP0697793  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-46 * column 2, line 16 - column 8, line 16 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2001053252  (CREQUE STUART [US]) [X] 1-46 * page 1, paragraph 7 - paragraph 11 * * page 1, paragraph 18 - page 4, paragraph 76 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2002139859  (CATAN CAROLYN RAMSEY [US]) [X] 1-46 * page 2, paragraph 17 - page 4, paragraph 27 * * page 5, paragraph 58 - page 18, paragraph 162 * * figure - *;
 [X]US6714969  (KLEIN JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * column 4, line 45 - column 24, line 23 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP1087305  (NCR INT INC [US]) [X] 1-46 * column 2, line 16 - line 54 * * column 3, line 12 - column 10, line 19 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP1318659  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-46 * column 3, paragraph 20 - column 9, paragraph 53 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5146552  (CASSORLA ELIE [US], et al) [A] 1-46 * the whole document *
 [X]  - ARAI T ET AL, "PAPERLINK: A TECHNIQUE FOR HYPERLINKING FROM REAL PAPER TO ELECTRONIC CONTENT", CHI 97. HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, NEW YORK, ACM.; US, (19970322), ISBN 978-0-89791-802-2, pages 327 - 334, XP000697132 [X] 1-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/258549.258782
International search[A]US2004015351  (GANDHI SHAILESH B [US], et al);
 [A]US5649060  (ELLOZY HAMED A [US], et al);
 [A]US2003004724  (KAHN JONATHAN [US], et al);
 [A]US2002110248  (KOVALES RENEE M [US], et al)