blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1753297

EP1753297 - ENZYMATIC PROCESS FOR OBTAINING INCREASED YIELD OF LACTOBIONIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  19.02.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.04.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2021Opposition rejectedpublished on 24.03.2021  [2021/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
For all designated states
Novozymes North America, Inc.
77 Perry Chapel Church Road
Franklinton, North Carolina 27525 / US
[2016/50]
Former [2010/50]For all designated states
Chr. Hansen A/S
Boege Allé 10-12, P.O. Box 407
2970 Hoersholm / DK
For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
For all designated states
Novozymes North America, Inc.
77 Perry Chapel Church Road
Franklinton, North Carolina 27525 / US
Former [2007/10]For all designated states
Novozymes North America, Inc.
77 Perry Chapel Church Road
Franklinton, North Carolina 27525 / US
For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Former [2007/08]For all designated states
CHR. HANSEN A/S
P.O. Box 407 Boge Alle 10-12
2970 Horsholm / DK
For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Inventor(s)01 / BUDTZ, Peter
Hoffmeyersvej 21
DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK
02 / VINDELØV, Jannik Torben
Svanholmsvej 5, 4. th.
DK-1905 Frederiksberg C / DK
03 / NIELSEN, Per Munk
Rytterstien 29A
DK-3400 Hillerød / DK
04 / ASHIE, Isaac
2404 Diquedo Drive
Raleigh, NC 27604 / US
05 / NORDKVIST, Mikkel
Bogtrykkervej 20, 4. th.
DK-2400 Copenhagen NV / DK
 [2007/33]
Former [2007/08]01 / BUDTZ, Peter
Hoffmeyersvej 21
DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK
02 / VINDELØV, Jannik Torben
Svanholmsvej 5, 4. th.
DK-1905 Frederiksberg C / DK
03 / NIELSEN, Per Munk
Rytterstien 29A
DK-3400 Hillerød / DK
04 / ASHIE, Isaac
1816 E Generation Drive
Raleigh, North Carolina 27612 / US
05 / NORDKVIST, Mikkel
Bogtrykkervej 20, 4. th.
DK-2400 Copenhagen NV / DK
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
Chapel Quarter
Mount Street
Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/39]Bauditz, Peter
Novozymes A/S
Patents
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Former [2007/08]Hagen, Klaus Bach
Chr. Hansen A/S IPR & Licensing Böge Allé 10-12
2970 Hörsholm / DK
Application number, filing date05735392.202.05.2005
[2007/08]
WO2005DK00299
Priority number, dateDK2004000070203.05.2004         Original published format: DK 200400702
US20040568157P04.05.2004         Original published format: US 568157 P
DK2004000098324.06.2004         Original published format: DK 200400983
US20040584690P01.07.2004         Original published format: US 584690 P
[2007/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2005104859
Date:10.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1753297
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1753297
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.12.2005
ClassificationIPC:A23C9/12, A23C9/127, A23C9/152, A23C21/02
[2007/08]
CPC:
A23C9/1213 (EP,US); A23C17/02 (EP,US); A23C19/054 (EP,US);
A23C21/02 (EP,US); A23C9/1275 (EP,US); A23C9/1322 (EP,US);
A23C9/1522 (EP,US); A23L27/82 (EP,US); C12P19/12 (EP,US);
C12Y101/03005 (EP,US); C12Y111/01006 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/39]
Former [2007/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ENZYMATISCHES VERFAHREN FÜR EINE ERHÖHTE LAKTOBIONSÄUREAUSBEUTE[2007/08]
English:ENZYMATIC PROCESS FOR OBTAINING INCREASED YIELD OF LACTOBIONIC ACID[2007/08]
French:PROCEDE ENZYMATIQUE POUR L'OBTENTION DE RENDEMENTS ACCRUS DE L'ACIDE LACTOBIONIQUE[2007/08]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2006National basic fee paid 
04.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/08]
07.02.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2017Fee for grant paid
17.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.06.2018    ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Nutrition BioSciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
3 Noble Street
London EC2V 7BQ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/31]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2018    ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Nutrition BioSciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
11.07.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.02.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.03.2020Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.04.2020
07.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
17.08.2020Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2020
25.08.2020Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
07.09.2020Reply to a communication from the opposition division
18.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
04.11.2020Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
14.11.2020Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2021/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
02.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.05.2005
AT27.09.2017
CY27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
PT27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
TR27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
LU02.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2020/31]
Former [2020/27]HU02.05.2005
AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
PT27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
TR27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
LU02.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2020/16]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
TR27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
LU02.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/24]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
LU02.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
LU02.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/23]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/10]FI27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
Former [2018/08]FI27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
Former [2018/07]LT27.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[XDA]WO02089592  (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-18,22,23,25,26 * page 11, lines 19-26; examples 12B,12C; claims 1,21 * [A] 19-21,24;
 [X]US3930028  (ULLMANN AGNES, et al) [X] 1,4,7-9,12-15,22 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0384534  (AVEBE COOP VERKOOP PROD [NL]) [A] 1-26 * example 3; claim - *;
 [DA]WO03037093  (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]) [DA] 1-26 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 25 *;
 [PX]US2004151802  (KOKA RAMARATHNA [US], et al) [PX] 1-18,22,23,25,26 * paragraphs [0037] , [0111] - [0115]; claims 1,21 *
 [XA]  - MIYAMOTO ET AL., "Production of lactobionic acid from whey by Pseudomonas sp. LS13-1", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (2000), vol. 22, pages 427 - 430, XP002350037 [X] 1-18,22,23,25,26 * the whole document * [A] 19,24

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005617903152
 [A]  - MURAKAMI H ET AL, "Fermentative production of lactobionic acid by Burkholderia cepacia.", JOURNAL OF APPLIED GLYCOSCIENCE, (2003), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 117 - 120, XP008036393 [A] 1-26 * page 118 - page 119; figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - RAND A, "DIRECT ENZYMATIC CONVERSION OF LACTOSE TO ACID: GLUCOSE OXIDASE AND HEXOSE OXIDASE", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, INSTITUTE OF FOOD TECHNOLOGISTS. CHICAGO, US, (1972), vol. 37, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1147, pages 698 - 701, XP008000509 [A] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.1972.tb02728.x
 [A]  - WRIGHT D G ET AL, "DIRECT ENZYMATIC CONVERSION OF LACTOSE TO ACID: LACTOSE DEHYDROGENASE", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, INSTITUTE OF FOOD TECHNOLOGISTS. CHICAGO, US, (1973), vol. 38, ISSN 0022-1147, pages 1132 - 1135, XP008000518 [A] 1-26 * page 1134 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.1973.tb07220.x
 [A]  - RAND A G ET AL, DIRECT ENZYMATIC CONVERSION OF LACTOSE IN MILK TO ACID, JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, AMERICAN DAIRY SCIENCE ASSOCIATION. CHAMPAIGN, ILLINOIS, US, PAGE(S) 1144-1150, (19750801), ISSN 0022-0302, XP000644502 [A] 1-26 * page 1145; figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(75)84693-5
OppositionUS568157
 US584690
 WO02089592
 WO0239828
 US3862005
 US2003113405
 WO9640935
 US617190
 US3005714
 EP0384534
 WO9931990
 US2004151802
 WO03037093
 WO2004060073
 US4402986
    - RAND et al., "DIRECT ENZYMATIC CONVERSION OF LACTOSE IN MILK TO ACID", Journal of Dairy Sciences, (19740000), vol. 58, pages 1144 - 1150, XP000644502

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(75)84693-5
    - RAND A., "DIRECT ENZYMATIC CONVERSION OF LACTOSE TO ACID", Journal of Food Science, (19720000), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 698 - 701, XP008000509

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.1972.tb02728.x
    - MIYAMOTO et al., "Production of lactobionic acid from whey by Pseudomonas sp. LS13-1", Biotechnology Letters, (20000000), vol. 22, pages 427 - 430, XP002350037

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005617903152
    - MURAKAMI et al., "Fermentative production of lactobionic acid by Burkholderia cepacia.", J. Appl. Glycosci., (20030000), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 117 - 120, XP008036393
    - MURAKAMI et al., "Screening of Lactobionic Acid Producing Microorganisms.", J. Appl. Glycosci., (20020000), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 469 - 477, XP055503331

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5458/jag.49.469
    - GHALY et al., "Effect of reseeding and pH control on the performance of a two-stage mesophilic anaerobic digester operating on acid cheese whey", Canadian Agricultural Engineering, (20000000), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 173 - 183, XP055503334
    - HANSEN et al., "Hexose Oxidase from the Red Alga Chondrus crispus", J Biol Chem, (19970000), vol. 272, no. 17, pages 11581 - 11587, XP002103629

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.17.11581
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.