Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1866910

EP1866910 - COMPRESSED DOMAIN ENCODING APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR USE WITH MEDIA SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.05.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nielsen Media Research, Inc.
770 N. Broadway
New York, NY 10003 / US
[2007/51]
Inventor(s)01 / PRICE, Lois
10437 Lightner Bridge Drive
Tampa, Florida 33626 / US
02 / RAMASWAMY, Arun
10710 Tavistock Drive
Tampa, Florida 33626 / US
03 / COOPER, Scott
884 Cypress Lakes Blvd.
Tarpon Springs, Florida 34688 / US
 [2007/51]
Representative(s)Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/51]Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05736583.519.04.2005
[2007/51]
WO2005US13507
Priority number, dateUS20050661527P14.03.2005         Original published format: US 661527 P
[2007/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006098736
Date:21.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1866910
Date:19.12.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006
[2007/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.09.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:G10L19/00
[2007/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE KOMPRIMIERTE DOMÄNE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT MEDIA-SIGNALEN[2007/51]
English:COMPRESSED DOMAIN ENCODING APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR USE WITH MEDIA SIGNALS[2007/51]
French:APPAREIL DE CODAGE DE DOMAINE COMPRIME ET METHODES POUR UTILISER DES SIGNAUX MEDIA[2007/51]
Entry into regional phase09.10.2007National basic fee paid 
09.10.2007Search fee paid 
09.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2007Examination requested  [2007/51]
22.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2013Date of oral proceedings
07.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
07.01.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination17.03.2014Appeal received No.  T1269/14
19.05.2014Statement of grounds filed
13.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.10.2011
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
05.10.2011Request for further processing filed
05.10.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.10.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2004038538  (NIELSEN MEDIA RES INC [US]; RAMASWAMY ARUN [US]; SRINIVASAN VENUGOPAL) [Y] 1-33 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0040] - [0046] - [0051] - [0059] - [0064] , [0065] , [0070] , [0071] *;
 [Y]WO03067886  (SONY UK LTD [GB]; TAYLOR ANDREW ROBERT [GB]; STONE JONATHAN JAMES [GB]) [Y] 1-33 * page 3 - page 6, line 0 * * page 41, lines 6-19 *;
 [A]WO02091361  (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US]) [A] 1-33 * page 1, line 16 - page 2, line 7 * * page 6, line 8 - page 10, line 20 * * page 11, line 26 - page 12, line 11 *;
 [A]  - MATTHEW A. WATSON, MICHAEL M. TRUMAN, "Signaling Techniques for Broadcast Applications", AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, Munich, (20020510), XP040371955 [A] 1-33 * Sections Abstract, Introduction, Unused bit replacement signaling *
International search[YP]US2005039064  ;
 [YP]US6804453  ;
 [Y]US2002173968  ;
 [Y]US6373960  ;
 [A]US2002150388  ;
 [A]US2002048450  ;
 [A]US2005022253  ;
 [A]US2004218093