Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1876552

EP1876552 - INFORMATION INPUT/OUTPUT METHOD USING DOT PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yoshida, Kenji
9-14-2302 Koishikawa 1-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 112-0002 / JP
[2012/44]
Former [2008/02]For all designated states
YOSHIDA, Kenji
9-14-2302 Koishikawa 1-chome Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 112-0002 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2008/02]
Representative(s)Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/44]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Former [2008/39]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Former [2008/02]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date05737287.228.04.2005
[2008/02]
WO2005JP08210
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006117869
Date:09.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1876552
Date:09.01.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006
[2008/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1876552
Date:31.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.11.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/06
[2012/16]
Former International [2008/02]G06K7/10, G06K19/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/02]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSEINGABE- UND AUSGABEVERFAHREN MIT EINEM PUNKTMUSTER[2012/16]
English:INFORMATION INPUT/OUTPUT METHOD USING DOT PATTERN[2008/02]
French:MÉTHODE D' ENTRÉE/SORTIE D' INFORMATIONS UTILISANT UN MOTIF DE POINTS[2008/02]
Former [2008/02]INFORMATIONSEINGABE-/-AUSGABEVERFAHREN MIT EINEM PUNKTMUSTER
Entry into regional phase08.11.2007Translation filed 
08.11.2007National basic fee paid 
08.11.2007Search fee paid 
08.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/02]
18.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2012Fee for grant paid
14.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12173995.7  / EP2511853
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.07.2013  08.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sonix Technology Co., Ltd.
10F-1, No. 36, Taiyuan Street
Chupei City, Hsinchu
Taiwan 30265 / TW
Opponent's representative
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/12]
Opponent(s)01  31.07.2013  08.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sonix Technology Co., Ltd.
10F-1, No. 36, Taiyuan Street
Chupei City, Hsinchu
Taiwan 30265 / TW
Opponent's representative
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Former [2013/37]
Opponent(s)01  31.07.2013  08.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sonix Technology Co., Ltd.
10F-1, No. 36, Taiyuan Street
Chupei City, Hsinchu
Taiwan 30265 / TW
Opponent's representative
Haydn, Christian
Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
04.09.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
09.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1567/15
05.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
01.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201208   M06   Fee paid on   01.08.2012
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.04.2005
AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
IE28.04.2013
LU28.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/20]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
IE28.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/08]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/01]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/23]CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
Former [2013/20]LT31.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1833001  (YOSHIDA KENJI [JP]) [E] 1,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] * * figure - *;
 [E]EP1876555  (YOSHIDA KENJI [JP]) [E] 1,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0078] * * figure - *;
 [A]WO2004084125  (YOSHIDA KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figure - *
International search[A]JP2003511761
by applicantWO2004084125