All documents: EP1774070  


Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1007
30.03.2017 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
30.03.2017 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
30.03.2017 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
30.03.2017 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
30.03.2017 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 16
16.03.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 23
26.01.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
26.01.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
25.10.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
18.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
18.10.2016 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 4
23.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.09.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
19.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
19.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
19.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
07.09.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.08.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
17.06.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
17.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.06.2016 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
09.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.05.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.05.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.05.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 4
29.04.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.03.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.04.2014 Claims Appeal 10
09.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.04.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
12.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
03.09.2013 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.09.2013 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
30.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
27.08.2013 Reply to appeal Search / examination 8
26.08.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
18.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.07.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
30.04.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
22.04.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.04.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 13
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 18
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 50
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 17
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 28
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
15.04.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
10.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
27.02.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.02.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.02.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.02.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.02.2013 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
18.02.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
18.02.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
18.02.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.02.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.02.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.02.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
08.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
11.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.12.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 12
05.12.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
05.12.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 17
05.12.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
05.12.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.12.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.12.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
05.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
05.12.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.12.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 13
26.10.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 5
23.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
22.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
22.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.09.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
21.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.09.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
03.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2012 Claims Opposition 2
27.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
27.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
27.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.06.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.06.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2012 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 4
19.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.11.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
16.11.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
03.08.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
19.07.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
19.07.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
10.06.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.06.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.05.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
04.05.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
04.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
04.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
08.07.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.06.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.06.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
16.06.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.02.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.02.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
26.02.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.02.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
27.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
27.01.2010 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
27.01.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.09.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
18.09.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.08.2009 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
13.08.2009 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
27.07.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.07.2009 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
06.02.2009 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
15.10.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
16.08.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
16.08.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
04.06.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
10.04.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
21.03.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.03.2007 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
14.03.2007 Request for change of address Search / examination 2
27.02.2007 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
05.02.2007 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
17.01.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.01.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.11.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.02.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
19.01.2006 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 42