Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1758777

EP1758777 - ROTOR AND EXCOTER RING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  02.02.2007
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2015New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Performance Friction Corporation
83 Carbon Metallic Highway
Clover, SC 29710 / US
[2014/03]
Former [2013/26]For all designated states
Chassis Brakes International B.V.
Rapenburgerstrasse 179/E
1011 VM Amsterdam / NL
Former [2012/49]For all designated states
Foundation Brakes Holding B.V.
126 rue de Stalingrad
93705 Drancy / FR
Former [2007/10]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Wernerstrasse 1
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / YUHAS, David, M.
14563 Heatherton Drive
Granger, IN 46530 / US
 [2007/10]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner , et al
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/03]Kador & Partner , et al
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2012/34]Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor , et al
Chassis Brakes International
126 rue de Stalingrad
93700 Drancy / FR
Application number, filing date05742104.202.05.2005
[2007/10]
WO2005IB04218
Priority number, dateUS2004070969524.05.2004         Original published format: US 709695
[2007/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005115100
Date:08.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1758777
Date:07.03.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005
[2007/10]
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/32
[2007/10]
Designated contracting states[2007/35]
Former [2007/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÜHLEN DES MOTORS[2007/10]
English:ROTOR AND EXCOTER RING[2007/10]
French:ROTOR ET ANNEAU D'EXCITATION[2007/10]
Entry into regional phase27.12.2006National basic fee paid 
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200703   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.200804   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.200905   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201006   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201107   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201208   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201309   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201410   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201511   M06   Not yet paid