Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1743225

EP1743225 - REDUNDANT COMPUTERIZING SYSTEM COMPRISING A MASTER PROGRAMMABLE AUTOMATON AND A STANDBY PROGRAMMABLE AUTOMATON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/03]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HUMPERT, Hans-Dieter
Bärenloh 3
91334 Hemhofen / DE
02 / KLEYER, Dieter
Am Hasengarten 6
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
 [2007/03]
Application number, filing date05742679.321.04.2005
[2007/03]
WO2005EP51782
Priority number, dateEP2004000999927.04.2004         Original published format: EP 04009999
[2007/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005106603
Date:10.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1743225
Date:17.01.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005
[2007/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1743225
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/05
[2007/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/03]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REDUNDANTES AUTOMATISIERUNGSSYSTEM UMFASSEND EIN MASTER- UND EIN STAND-BY-AUTOMATISIERUNGSGERÄT[2007/03]
English:REDUNDANT COMPUTERIZING SYSTEM COMPRISING A MASTER PROGRAMMABLE AUTOMATON AND A STANDBY PROGRAMMABLE AUTOMATON[2007/03]
French:SYSTEME D'AUTOMATISATION REDONDANT COMPRENANT UN AUTOMATE PROGRAMMABLE MAITRE ET UN AUTOMATE PROGRAMMABLE RESERVE[2007/03]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2006National basic fee paid 
07.08.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.08.2006Examination requested  [2007/03]
19.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2008Fee for grant paid
22.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
LU21.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2011/32]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
LU21.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/22]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
LU21.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/01]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/25]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/21]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/12]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/52]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/48]DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
IS18.06.2009
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US6424258  (CLAES JOSEPH [BE]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 51 - column 5, line 19 * * figure 1 * [A] 5 [Y] 6-8;
 [YA]DE10064673  (RENK AG [DE]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0018] * * figure 1 * [A] 1;
 [Y]EP1385070  (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0002] *
 [XY]  - FREDERICKSON A A, "FAULT TOLERANT PROGRAMMABLE FOR SAFETY SYSTEMS", ISA TRANSACTIONS, INSTRUMENT SOCIETY OF AMERICA. PITTSBURGH, US, (1990), vol. 29, no. 2, ISSN 0019-0578, pages 13 - 16, XP000114560 [X] 1-4 * page 14 * * figure 1 * [Y] 6-8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0019-0578(90)90059-T
 [Y]  - FISCHER R, "FAULT-TOLERANT PLCS ELIMINATE PRODUCTION STANDSTILL", SIEMENS ENERGY & AUTOMATION, SIEMENS AG. BERLIN, DE, (19900501), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 6 - 7, XP000137612 [Y] 6 * page 6, column R, paragraph 1 *