Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1744902

EP1744902 - SECURITY ELEMENT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.12.2009
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
[2007/04]
Inventor(s)01 / HOFFMÜLLER, Winfried
Marktstr. 75
83646 Bad Tölz / DE
02 / BURCHARD, Theodor
Buchleiten 1
83703 Gmund / DE
 [2007/04]
Representative(s)Zeuner Summerer Stütz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft
Nußbaumstraße 8
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/02]Zeuner & Summerer
Patentanwälte, Partnerschaft Hedwigstraße 9
D-80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date05743212.229.04.2005
[2007/04]
WO2005EP04673
Priority number, dateDE2004102124730.04.2004         Original published format: DE102004021247
[2007/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005105473
Date:10.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1744902
Date:24.01.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005
[2007/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1744902
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:B42D15/00, G02B5/30
[2007/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2007/04]
English:SECURITY ELEMENT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2007/04]
French:ELEMENT DE SECURITE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2007/04]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2006National basic fee paid 
30.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/04]
23.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2008Fee for grant paid
27.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
TR04.02.2009
LU29.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
HU05.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
LU29.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
HU05.08.2009
Former [2011/22]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
LU29.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2011/01]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2010/25]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2010/21]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2010/12]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2009/52]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2009/48]DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]US2003012935  (KUNTZ MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [A] 1,8,14,20,22,24,33,36,41,43 * page 2, paragraphs 19,26,28 * * page 1, paragraphs 8,11 * * page 3, paragraphs 35-38 *;
 [A]WO9852077  (ROLIC AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,8,9,12,13,20-23,33,36,37,40,41,43 * page 13, line 1 - page 15, line 22 * * page 17, lines 12-24 * * page 18, lines 6-15 * * figures 7-12 *;
 [A]WO2004028824  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,14,19,20,22-24,26-29,33,36,37 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 24 * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 5 * * page 16, lines 16-28 * * page 7, lines 18-29 *;
 [A]US5678863  (KNIGHT MALCOLM ROBERT MURRAY [GB], et al) [A] 1,14,22,33,37,41 * column 2, lines 1-21 * * column 3, lines 12-14,48-61 * * column 4, paragraphs 7-23 * * figure 8 *;
 [DA]EP1156934  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,14,20,22 * paragraph [0025] *
ExaminationEP0899119
by applicantEP0435029
 EP1156934