Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1767672

EP1767672 - TIN-BASED PLATING FILM AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.10.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rambo Chemicals (H.K.) Ltd.
11/F. Block B-D, Wah Wing Ind. Bldg 14-20 Wing Yip Street
Kwai Chung, N.T., Hong Kong SAR / CN
For all designated states
Okuno Chemical Industries Co., Ltd.
7-10, Doshomachi 4-Chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/13]For all designated states
Rambo Chemicals (H.K.) Ltd.
11/F. Block B-D, Wah Wing Ind. Bldg 14-20 Wing Yip Street
Kwai Chung, N.T., Hong Kong SAR / CN
For all designated states
Okuno Chemical Industries Co. Ltd
7-10, Doshomachi 4-Chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0045 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KWOK, Chun Wah, Jimmy, 4D/F., Block 14
Phase III, Beacon Heights, 14 Lung Ping Road
Kowloon, Hong Kong SAR / CN
02 / KWOK, Yim Wah, Rosaline, Flat 1A/F.
Rose Court, 24 Rose Street, Yau Yat Chuen
Kowloon, Hong Kong SAR / CN
03 / NAKAGISHI, Yutaka, OKUNO CHEMICAL IND. CO. LTD.
Main Research Lab., 10-25, Hanatenshigashi 1-chome
Tsurumi-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 5380044 / JP
 [2007/13]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2007/13]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date05743664.427.05.2005
[2007/13]
WO2005JP09784
Priority number, dateJP2004018307821.06.2004         Original published format: JP 2004183078
[2007/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005123987
Date:29.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1767672
Date:28.03.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005
[2007/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.12.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:C25D5/10, C23C18/48
[2007/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2007/39]
Former [2007/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUF ZINN BASIERENDER GALVANISCH ABGESCHIEDENER FILM UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2007/13]
English:TIN-BASED PLATING FILM AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE SAME[2007/13]
French:FILM DE PLACAGE A BASE DE FER BLANC ET SA METHODE DE FORMATION[2007/13]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2006Translation filed 
20.12.2006National basic fee paid 
20.12.2006Search fee paid 
20.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/13]
16.10.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US6361823  (BOKISA GEORGE S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 3, line 31 - line 44 * * column 18, line 47 - line 67 * * column 23 - column 24; claims 1,3-8,18,19 *
International search[X]JP2003147580
 [X]JPS51143553
 [A]JPH06196349