Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1754768

EP1754768 - POLYMERIZABLE LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITION AND OPTICALLY ANISOTROPIC BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2012
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.03.2012  [2012/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIC Corporation
35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2008/28]
Former [2007/08]For all designated states
Dainippon Ink and Chemicals, Incorporated
35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-8520 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAMURA, Jyoji
3-5-4-206, Takino, Motono-mura, Innba-gun
Chiba 2702329 / JP
02 / ONO, Yoshiyuki
2-14-9, Izumidai
Yachimata-shi, Chiba 2891105 / JP
03 / SUZUKI, Yasuyuki
3-29-14, Higashihatsutomi
Kamagaya-shi, Chiba 2730122 / JP
04 / HAYAKAWA, Hitoshi
4510-4, Murakami
Yachiyo-shi, Chiba 2760028 / JP
05 / NISHIYAMA, Isa
3-4-5-3-204, Oosakidai
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2850817 / JP
06 / WATANABE, Yasuyuki
2-1-1-20-1409, Mizuho, Hanamigawa-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 2620026 / JP
07 / KUWANA, Yasuhiro
2-21-1399, Honda-cho, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 2660005 / JP
 [2008/22]
Former [2008/15]01 / KAWAMURA, Jyoji
3-5-4-206, Takino, Motono-mura, Innba-gun
Chiba 2702329 / JP
02 / ONO, Yoshiyuki
2-14-9, Izumidai
Yachimata-shi, Chiba 2891105 / JP
03 / SUZUKI, Yasuyuki
3-29-14, Higashihatsutomi
Kamagaya-shi, Chiba 2730122 / JP
04 / HAYAKAWA, Hitoshi
4510-4, Murakami
Yachiyo-shi, Chiba 2760028 / JP
05 / NISHIYAMA, Isa
3-4-5-3-204, Oosakidai
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2850817 / JP
06 / WATANABE, Yasuyuki
2-1-1-20-1409, Mizuho, Mizuho,Hanamigawa-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 2620026 / JP
07 / KUWANA, Yasuhiro
2-21-1399, Honda-cho, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 2660005 / JP
Former [2007/42]01 / KAWAMURA, Jyoji
3-5-4-206, Takino, Motono-mura,innba-gun
Chiba 2702329 / JP
02 / ONO, Yoshiyuki
2-14-9, Izumidai
Yachimata-shi, Chiba 2891105 / JP
03 / SUZUKI, Yasuyuki
3-29-14, Higashihatsutomi
Kamagaya-shi, Chiba 2730122 / JP
04 / HAYAKAWA, Hitoshi
4510-4, Murakami
Yachiyo-shi, Chiba 2760028 / JP
05 / NISHIYAMA, Isa
3-4-5-3-204, Oosakidai
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2850817 / JP
06 / WATANABE, Yasuyuki
2-1-1-20-1409, Mizuho, Mizuho,Hanamigawa-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 2620026 / JP
07 / KUWANA, Yasuhiro
2-21-1399, Honda-cho, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 2660005 / JP
Former [2007/35]01 / KAWAMURA, Jyoji
3-5-4-206, Takino, Motono-mura,iInnba-gun
Chiba 2702329 / JP
02 / ONO, Yoshiyuki
2-14-9, Izumidai
Yachimata-shi, Chiba 2891105 / JP
03 / SUZUKI, Yasuyuki
3-29-14, Higashihatsutomi
Kamagaya-shi, Chiba 2730122 / JP
04 / HAYAKAWA, Hitoshi
4510-4, Murakami
Yachiyo-shi, Chiba 2760028 / JP
05 / NISHIYAMA, Isa
3-4-5-3-204, Oosakidai
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2850817 / JP
06 / WATANABE, Yasuyuki
2-1-1-20-1409, Mizuho, Mizuho,Hanamigawa-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 2620026 / JP
07 / KUWANA, Yasuhiro
2-21-1399, Honda-cho, Midori-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba
Chiba-shi, Chiba 2660005 / JP
Former [2007/08]01 / KAWAMURA, Jyoji
3-5-4-206, Takino, Motono-mura,iInnba-gun
Chiba 2702329 / JP
02 / ONO, Yoshiyuki
2-14-9, Izumidai
Yachimata-shi, Chiba 2891105 / JP
03 / SUZUKI, Yasuyuki
3-29-14, Higashihatsutomi
Kamagaya-shi, Chiba 2730122 / JP
04 / HAYAKAWA, Hitoshi
4510-4, Murakami
Yachiyo-shi, Chiba 2760028 / JP
05 / NISHIYAMA, Isa
3-4-5-3-204, Oosakidai
sakura-shi, Chiba 2850817 / JP
06 / WATANABE, Yasuyuki
2-1-1-20-1409, Mizuho, Mizuho,Hanamigawa-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 2620026 / JP
07 / KUWANA, Yasuhiro
2-21-1399, Honda-cho, Midori-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba
Chiba-shi, Chiba 2660005 / JP
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/08]Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date05743777.426.05.2005
[2007/08]
WO2005JP09638
Priority number, dateJP2004016123031.05.2004         Original published format: JP 2004161230
[2007/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005116165
Date:08.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1754768
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005
[2007/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1754768
Date:30.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.12.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C09K19/38, C09K19/54
[2009/09]
Former International [2007/08]C09K19/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/36]
Former [2007/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYMERISIERBARE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLINE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG SOWIE OPTISCH ANISOTROPER KÖRPER[2007/08]
English:POLYMERIZABLE LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITION AND OPTICALLY ANISOTROPIC BODY[2007/08]
French:COMPOSITION DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES POLYMÉRISABLE ET CORPS ANISOTROPE OPTIQUEMENT[2007/08]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2006Translation filed 
27.11.2006National basic fee paid 
27.11.2006Search fee paid 
27.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/08]
30.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2011Fee for grant paid
14.02.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
17.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JP2003105030  (MERCK PATENT GMBH);
 [A]JP2003227935  (NITTO DENKO CORP);
 [A]JPH11148080  (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS)
by applicantJP2000345164
 JP2003227935
 JP2000105315
 EP1256617
 JPH11148080