blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1756996

EP1756996 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR OPTIMUM FILE TRANSFERS IN A TIME-VARYING NETWORK ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.2008
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2008  [2008/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm, Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2007/09]
Inventor(s)01 / NAGARAJ, Thadi M.
11820-2 Cypress Canyon Road
Solana Beach, CA 92131 / US
 [2007/09]
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/09]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date05743942.405.05.2005
[2007/09]
WO2005US15907
Priority number, dateUS20040568161P05.05.2004         Original published format: US 568161 P
[2007/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005109719
Date:17.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1756996
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.11.2005
ClassificationIPC:H04L1/00, H04L1/18
[2007/09]
CPC:
H04L1/1628 (EP,US); H04L12/16 (KR); H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L1/0034 (EP,US); H04L1/16 (EP,US); H04L1/188 (EP,US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,US); H04L47/10 (EP,US); H04L47/25 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,US); H04W28/10 (KR); Y02D30/50 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR OPTIMALE DATEITRANSFERS IN EINER ZEITVERÄNDERLICHEN NETZWERKUMGEBUNG[2007/09]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR OPTIMUM FILE TRANSFERS IN A TIME-VARYING NETWORK ENVIRONMENT[2007/09]
French:PROCEDES ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DES TRANSFERTS DE FICHIERS OPTIMUM DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT RESEAU VARIANT DANS LE TEMPS[2007/09]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2006National basic fee paid 
16.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/09]
16.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/21]
08.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002150048  (HA SUNGWON [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] - [0015] - [0036] , [0065] , [0086] *;
 [A]US2003206524  (MOHANTY BIBHU [US], et al) [A] 1-40* abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.