Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1771784

EP1771784 - TRIGGERING ACTIONS IN RESPONSE TO OPTICALLY OR ACOUSTICALLY CAPTURING KEYWORDS FROM A RENDERED DOCUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.05.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2011/22]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Former [2007/15]For all designated states
Exbiblio B.V.
Hemonystraat 11
1074 BK Amsterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KING, Martin T.
17322 115th Ave. SW
Vashon Island, wa 98070 / US
02 / KUSHLER, Clifford A.
20615 36th Place West
Lynnwood, wa 98036-5094 / US
03 / STAFFORD-FRASER, James Quentin
20 Marlowe Road
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 9JW / GB
04 / GROVER, Dale Lawrence
511 Little Lake Drive
Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US
 [2007/15]
Representative(s)Suckling, Andrew Michael , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park
Heatley Road
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/11]Schley, Jan Malte , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8
80807 München / DE
Former [2009/45]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2008/50]Brophy, David Timothy , et al
F.R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2007/15]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05744478.801.04.2005
[2007/15]
WO2005US11016
Priority number, dateUS20040558527P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558527 P
US20040559265P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 559265 P
US20040558893P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558893 P
US20040558499P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558499 P
US20040559279P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 559279 P
US20040558760P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558760 P
US20040558789P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558789 P
US20040558867P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558867 P
US20040558969P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558969 P
US20040558717P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558717 P
US20040558791P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558791 P
US20040559277P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 559277 P
US20040559278P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 559278 P
US20040559226P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 559226 P
US20040558370P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558370 P
US20040558968P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558968 P
US20040558892P01.04.2004         Original published format: US 558892 P
US20040559125P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 559125 P
US20040559087P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 559087 P
US20040559033P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 559033 P
US20040559127P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 559127 P
US20040559131P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 559131 P
US20040558909P02.04.2004         Original published format: US 558909 P
US20040559766P06.04.2004         Original published format: US 559766 P
US20040561768P12.04.2004         Original published format: US 561768 P
US20040563485P19.04.2004         Original published format: US 563485 P
US20040563520P19.04.2004         Original published format: US 563520 P
US20040564688P23.04.2004         Original published format: US 564688 P
US20040564846P23.04.2004         Original published format: US 564846 P
US20040571381P14.05.2004         Original published format: US 571381 P
US20040571560P14.05.2004         Original published format: US 571560 P
US20040571715P17.05.2004         Original published format: US 571715 P
US20040589201P19.07.2004         Original published format: US 589201 P
US20040598821P02.08.2004         Original published format: US 598821 P
US20040602896P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602896 P
US20040602897P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602897 P
US20040602925P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602925 P
US20040602898P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602898 P
US20040602947P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602947 P
US20040602956P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602956 P
US20040603081P19.08.2004         Original published format: US 603081 P
US20040603358P19.08.2004         Original published format: US 603358 P
US20040603082P19.08.2004         Original published format: US 603082 P
US20040603466P19.08.2004         Original published format: US 603466 P
US20040603498P19.08.2004         Original published format: US 603498 P
US20040604098P23.08.2004         Original published format: US 604098 P
US20040604100P23.08.2004         Original published format: US 604100 P
US20040604102P23.08.2004         Original published format: US 604102 P
US20040604103P23.08.2004         Original published format: US 604103 P
US20040605105P27.08.2004         Original published format: US 605105 P
US20040605229P27.08.2004         Original published format: US 605229 P
US20040613242P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613242 P
US20040613339P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613339 P
US20040613340P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613340 P
US20040613341P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613341 P
US20040613361P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613361 P
US20040613400P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613400 P
US20040613454P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613454 P
US20040613455P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613455 P
US20040613456P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613456 P
US20040613460P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613460 P
US20040613461P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613461 P
US20040613589P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613589 P
US20040613602P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613602 P
US20040613633P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613633 P
US20040613634P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613634 P
US20040615112P01.10.2004         Original published format: US 615112 P
US20040615378P01.10.2004         Original published format: US 615378 P
US20040615538P01.10.2004         Original published format: US 615538 P
US20040617122P07.10.2004         Original published format: US 617122 P
US20040622906P28.10.2004         Original published format: US 622906 P
US20040633452P06.12.2004         Original published format: US 633452 P
US20040633453P06.12.2004         Original published format: US 633453 P
US20040633486P06.12.2004         Original published format: US 633486 P
US20040633678P06.12.2004         Original published format: US 633678 P
US20040634627P09.12.2004         Original published format: US 634627 P
US20040634739P09.12.2004         Original published format: US 634739 P
US20050648746P31.01.2005         Original published format: US 648746 P
US20050653372P15.02.2005         Original published format: US 653372 P
US20050653663P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653663 P
US20050653669P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653669 P
US20050653679P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653679 P
US20050653847P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653847 P
US20050653899P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653899 P
US20050654368P18.02.2005         Original published format: US 654368 P
US20050654196P18.02.2005         Original published format: US 654196 P
US20050654326P18.02.2005         Original published format: US 654326 P
US20050654379P17.02.2005         Original published format: US 654379 P
US20050655279P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655279 P
US20050655280P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655280 P
US20050655281P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655281 P
US20050655697P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655697 P
US20050655987P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655987 P
US20050657309P28.02.2005         Original published format: US 657309 P
US20040004637P03.12.2004         Original published format: US 4637 P
US20040566667P30.04.2004         Original published format: US 566667 P
US20040602930P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602930 P
US20040613628P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613628 P
US20040613243P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613243 P
US20040613632P27.09.2004         Original published format: US 613632 P
US20050647684P26.01.2005         Original published format: US 647684 P
US20040589202P19.07.2004         Original published format: US 589202 P
US20040589203P19.07.2004         Original published format: US 589203 P
[2012/31]
Former [2012/28]US20040558527P01.04.2004
US20040559265P01.04.2004
US20040558893P01.04.2004
US20040558499P01.04.2004
US20040559279P01.04.2004
US20040558760P01.04.2004
US20040558789P01.04.2004
US20040558867P01.04.2004
US20040558969P01.04.2004
US20040558717P01.04.2004
US20040558791P01.04.2004
US20040559277P01.04.2004
US20040559278P01.04.2004
US20040559226P01.04.2004
US20040558370P01.04.2004
US20040558968P01.04.2004
US20040558892P01.04.2004
US20040559125P02.04.2004
US20040559087P02.04.2004
US20040559033P02.04.2004
US20040559127P02.04.2004
US20040559131P02.04.2004
US20040558909P02.04.2004
US20040559766P06.04.2004
US20040561768P12.04.2004
US20040563485P19.04.2004
US20040563520P19.04.2004
US20040564688P23.04.2004
US20040564846P23.04.2004
US20040571381P14.05.2004
US20040571560P14.05.2004
US20040571715P17.05.2004
US20040589201P19.07.2004
US20040598821P02.08.2004
US20040602896P18.08.2004
US20040602897P18.08.2004
US20040602925P18.08.2004
US20040602893P18.08.2004
US20040602947P18.08.2004
US20040602956P18.08.2004
US20040603081P19.08.2004
US20040603358P19.08.2004
US20040603082P19.08.2004
US20040603466P19.08.2004
US20040603498P19.08.2004
US20040604098P23.08.2004
US20040604100P23.08.2004
US20040604102P23.08.2004
US20040604103P23.08.2004
US20040605105P27.08.2004
US20040605229P27.08.2004
US20040613242P27.09.2004
US20040613339P27.09.2004
US20040613340P27.09.2004
US20040613341P27.09.2004
US20040613361P27.09.2004
US20040613400P27.09.2004
US20040613454P27.09.2004
US20040613455P27.09.2004
US20040613456P27.09.2004
US20040613460P27.09.2004
US20040613461P27.09.2004
US20040613589P27.09.2004
US20040613602P27.09.2004
US20040613633P27.09.2004
US20040613634P27.09.2004
US20040615112P01.10.2004
US20040615378P01.10.2004
US20040615538P01.10.2004
US20040617122P07.10.2004
US20040622906P28.10.2004
US20040633452P06.12.2004
US20040633453P06.12.2004
US20040633486P06.12.2004
US20040633678P06.12.2004
US20040634627P09.12.2004
US20040634739P09.12.2004
US20050648746P31.01.2005
US20050653372P15.02.2005
US20050653663P16.02.2005
US20050653669P16.02.2005
US20050653679P16.02.2005
US20050653847P16.02.2005
US20050653899P16.02.2005
US20050654368P18.02.2005
US20050654196P18.02.2005
US20050654326P18.02.2005
US20050654379P17.02.2005
US20050655279P22.02.2005
US20050655280P22.02.2005
US20050655281P22.02.2005
US20050655697P22.02.2005
US20050655987P22.02.2005
US20050657309P28.02.2005
US20040004637P03.12.2004
US20040566667P30.04.2004
US20040602898P18.08.2004
US20040613628P27.09.2004
US20040613243P27.09.2004
US20040613632P27.09.2004
US20050647684P26.01.2005
US20040589202P19.07.2004
US20040589203P19.07.2004
US20040602930P18.08.2004
Former [2007/15]US20040558527P01.04.2004
US20040559265P01.04.2004
US20040558893P01.04.2004
US20040558499P01.04.2004
US20040559279P01.04.2004
US20040558760P01.04.2004
US20040558789P01.04.2004
US20040558867P01.04.2004
US20040558969P01.04.2004
US20040558717P01.04.2004
US20040558791P01.04.2004
US20040559277P01.04.2004
US20040559278P01.04.2004
US20040559226P01.04.2004
US20040558370P01.04.2004
US20040558968P01.04.2004
US20040558892P01.04.2004
US20040559125P02.04.2004
US20040559087P02.04.2004
US20040559033P02.04.2004
US20040559127P02.04.2004
US20040559131P02.04.2004
US20040558909P02.04.2004
US20040559766P06.04.2004
US20040561768P12.04.2004
US20040563485P19.04.2004
US20040563520P19.04.2004
US20040564688P23.04.2004
US20040564846P23.04.2004
US20040571381P14.05.2004
US20040571560P14.05.2004
US20040571715P17.05.2004
US20040589201P19.07.2004
US20040598821P02.08.2004
US20040602896P18.08.2004
US20040602897P18.08.2004
US20040602925P18.08.2004
US20040602893P18.08.2004
US20040602947P18.08.2004
US20040602956P18.08.2004
US20040603081P19.08.2004
US20040603358P19.08.2004
US20040603082P19.08.2004
US20040603466P19.08.2004
US20040603498P19.08.2004
US20040604098P23.08.2004
US20040604100P23.08.2004
US20040604102P23.08.2004
US20040604103P23.08.2004
US20040605105P27.08.2004
US20040605229P27.08.2004
US20040613242P27.09.2004
US20040613339P27.09.2004
US20040613340P27.09.2004
US20040613341P27.09.2004
US20040613361P27.09.2004
US20040613400P27.09.2004
US20040613454P27.09.2004
US20040613455P27.09.2004
US20040613456P27.09.2004
US20040613460P27.09.2004
US20040613461P27.09.2004
US20040613589P27.09.2004
US20040613602P27.09.2004
US20040613633P27.09.2004
US20040613634P27.09.2004
US20040615112P01.10.2004
US20040615378P01.10.2004
US20040615538P01.10.2004
US20040617122P07.10.2004
US20040622906P28.10.2004
US20040633452P06.12.2004
US20040633453P06.12.2004
US20040633486P06.12.2004
US20040633678P06.12.2004
US20040634627P09.12.2004
US20040634739P09.12.2004
US20050648746P31.01.2005
US20050653372P15.02.2005
US20050653663P16.02.2005
US20050653669P16.02.2005
US20050653679P16.02.2005
US20050653847P16.02.2005
US20050653899P16.02.2005
US20050654368P18.02.2005
US20050654196P18.02.2005
US20050654326P18.02.2005
US20050654379P17.02.2005
US20050655279P22.02.2005
US20050655280P22.02.2005
US20050655281P22.02.2005
US20050655697P22.02.2005
US20050655987P22.02.2005
US20050657309P28.02.2005
US20040004637P03.12.2004
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005098599
Date:20.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1771784
Date:11.04.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005
[2007/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.10.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06F17/30
[2009/19]
Former International [2007/15]G06F7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/15]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRIGGERN VON AKTIONEN ALS REAKTION AUF DIE OPTISCHE ODER AKUSTISCHE ERFASSUNG VON SCHLÜSSELWÖRTERN AUS EINEM WIEDERGEGEBENEN DOKUMENT[2007/15]
English:TRIGGERING ACTIONS IN RESPONSE TO OPTICALLY OR ACOUSTICALLY CAPTURING KEYWORDS FROM A RENDERED DOCUMENT[2007/15]
French:ACTIONS DE DECLENCHEMENT EN REPONSE A LA SAISIE OPTIQUE OU SONORE DE MOTS-CLES A PARTIR D'UN DOCUMENT RENDU[2007/15]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2006National basic fee paid 
31.10.2006Search fee paid 
31.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.10.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2006Examination requested  [2007/15]
09.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
25.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.03.2017
09.03.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
19.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination29.06.2017Appeal received No.  T2157/17
22.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP12002745.3  / EP2490152
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2010
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.04.2011Request for further processing filed
04.04.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.05.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201006   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2366033  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-33 * page 4, line 10 - page 7, line 6 * * page 9, line 25 - page 17, line 20 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2003152293  (BRESLER JOEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-33 * page 1, paragraph 11 - page 2, paragraph 20 * * page 2, paragraph 33 - paragraph 38 * * page 3, paragraph 68 - page 12, paragraph 233 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP1054335  (DIGIMARC CORP [US]) [X] 1-33 * page 5, line 10 - page 59, line 9 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP0697793  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-33 * column 2, line 16 - column 8, line 16 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2001053252  (CREQUE STUART [US]) [X] 1-33 * page 1, paragraph 7 - paragraph 11 * * page 1, paragraph 18 - page 4, paragraph 76 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2002139859  (CATAN CAROLYN RAMSEY [US]) [X] 1-33 * page 2, paragraph 17 - page 4, paragraph 27 * * page 5, paragraph 58 - page 18, paragraph 162 * * figure - *;
 [X]US6714969  (KLEIN JOHN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-33 * column 4, line 45 - column 24, line 23 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP1087305  (NCR INT INC [US]) [X] 1-33 * column 2, line 16 - line 54 * * column 3, line 12 - column 10, line 19 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP1318659  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-33 * column 3, paragraph 20 - column 9, paragraph 53 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5146552  (CASSORLA ELIE [US] ET AL) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *
 [X]  - ARAI T ET AL, "PAPERLINK: A TECHNIQUE FOR HYPERLINKING FROM REAL PAPER TO ELECTRONIC CONTENT", CHI 97. HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, NEW YORK, ACM.; US, (19970322), ISBN 978-0-89791-802-2, pages 327 - 334, XP000697132 [X] 1-33 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/258549.258782
International search[Y]US6002798  (PALMER DOUGLAS L [US], et al);
 [Y]US6026338  (BORSCHERT UDO [DE], et al);
 [Y]US6571235  (MARPE JAMES S [US], et al)
by applicantGB236603