Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1765254

EP1765254 - STERILE PORT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.01.2012
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2015New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE
[2007/13]
Inventor(s)01 / KVASNICKA, Annette
Bahnhofstrasse 2
61273 Wehrheim / DE
02 / KNIERBEIN, Bernd
Emil-Müller-Weg 5
61267 Neu-Anspach / DE
03 / GRÜNEBERG, Manfred
Bierhausweg
61273 Wehrheim / DE
 [2007/13]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/04]
Former [2007/13]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner
Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date05744812.819.05.2005
[2007/13]
WO2005EP05422
Priority number, dateDE2004103320509.07.2004         Original published format: DE102004033205
[2007/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006005391
Date:19.01.2006
Language:DE
[2006/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1765254
Date:28.03.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006
[2007/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1765254
Date:22.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61J1/14
[2011/25]
Former International [2007/13]A61J1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/13]
TitleGerman:STERILER PORT[2007/13]
English:STERILE PORT[2007/13]
French:PORT STERILE[2011/25]
Former [2007/13]ORIFICE STERILE
Entry into regional phase05.12.2006National basic fee paid 
05.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/13]
08.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2011Fee for grant paid
08.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.05.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.11.2012   
MACO PHARMA
rue Lorthiois
59420 Mouvaux / FR
Opponent's representative
Herrou, Nathalie
Maco Pharma
R&D / Propriété Industrielle
200, chaussée Fernand Forest
59200 Tourcoing / FR
 [2012/52]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
11.01.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.05.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
30.01.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.01.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition25.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0620/15
29.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
18.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.05.2005
CY22.02.2012
CZ22.02.2012
DK22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
IT22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
PL22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
SI22.02.2012
SK22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
AT19.05.2012
LU19.05.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY22.02.2012
CZ22.02.2012
DK22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
IT22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
PL22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
SI22.02.2012
SK22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
AT19.05.2012
LU19.05.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2014/21]CY22.02.2012
CZ22.02.2012
DK22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
IT22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
PL22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
SI22.02.2012
SK22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
AT19.05.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2013/36]CY22.02.2012
CZ22.02.2012
DK22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
IT22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
PL22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
SI22.02.2012
SK22.02.2012
AT19.05.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2013/33]CY22.02.2012
CZ22.02.2012
DK22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
IT22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
PL22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
SI22.02.2012
SK22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2012/50]CY22.02.2012
CZ22.02.2012
DK22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
IT22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
PL22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
SI22.02.2012
SK22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2012/49]CY22.02.2012
CZ22.02.2012
DK22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
PL22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
SI22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2012/48]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2012/47]CY22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2012/36]LT22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT22.02.2012
IS22.06.2012
Former [2012/33]LT22.02.2012
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE10313760  (FRESENIUS KABI DE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8-11,13,15 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] * * figures 1,4 * [Y] 7,14,16 [I] 4,12;
 [Y]EP0830874  (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [Y] 7,14 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 3-5 *;
 [Y]DE19842960  (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [Y] 16 * figure 3 *
by applicantEP0830874