Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1747619

EP1747619 - INSTANT MESSAGING TERMINAL ADAPTED FOR WI-FI ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zipit Wireless, Inc.
200 N. Main Street Suite 300
Greenville, SC 29601 / US
[2010/33]
Former [2008/09]For all designated states
Zipit Wireless, Inc.
49 Salters Road, Suiote 6
Greenville, SC 29607 / US
Former [2007/05]For all designated states
Aeronix, Inc.
1775 West Hibiscus Blvd.
Melbourne, FL 32901 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HEREDIA, Rafael
1100 Kensington Lake Drive
Easley, SC 29642-9366 / US
02 / GREER, Frank, U.
206 Meeting Place
Greenville, SC 29615 / US
03 / DEAN, Michael, P.
108 Clearstone Court
Easley, SC 29642 / US
 [2007/05]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/09]Isarpatent
Patentanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Former [2012/18]Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Former [2007/05]Charles, Glyndwr
Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner, Patentanwälte, Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date05746887.805.05.2005
[2007/05]
WO2005US15683
Priority number, dateUS2004084623614.05.2004         Original published format: US 846236
[2007/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005119948
Date:15.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1747619
Date:31.01.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005
[2007/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1747619
Date:02.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.08.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/00, H04B1/38, H04M1/66, H04M1/68, H04M3/16, H04M3/42, H04M1/00, H04M1/725
[2013/29]
Former International [2007/05]H04B7/00, H04B1/38, H04M1/66, H04M1/68, H04M3/16, H04M3/42, H04M1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/09]
Former [2007/05]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:FÜR WIFI-ZUGANG AUSGELEGTES INSTANT-MESSAGING-ENDGERÄT[2007/05]
English:INSTANT MESSAGING TERMINAL ADAPTED FOR WI-FI ACCESS[2007/05]
French:TERMINAL DE MESSAGERIE INSTANTANEE ADAPTE A DES POINTS D'ACCES WIFI[2007/05]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2006National basic fee paid 
14.11.2006Search fee paid 
14.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/05]
02.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2015Fee for grant paid
21.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.12.2013
Opposition(s)05.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
30.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.05.2005
AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CY02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
TR02.03.2016
IE05.05.2016
LU05.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
BG02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
[2018/29]
Former [2018/28]HU05.05.2005
AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CY02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
IE05.05.2016
LU05.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
BG02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/38]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
IE05.05.2016
LU05.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
BG02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/13]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
LU05.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
BG02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
LU05.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/04]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
LU05.05.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/49]AT02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/48]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/40]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR03.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR03.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR03.06.2016
Former [2016/35]ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
GR03.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2004015547  (GRIFFIN CHRIS MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] - [0031] , [0040] , [0046] , [0050]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 7 [I] 2-6;
 [Y]US2003130014  (RUCINSKI DAVID B [US]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0034] *;
 [A]EP1050794  (PHONE COM INC [US]) [A] 6 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] *
International search[X]US2003130014  (RUCINSKI DAVID B [US]);
 [Y]US6629793  (MILLER STEVE [US]);
 [Y]WO0141477  (ARREO COMM INC [KR], et al);
 [Y]US2003140103  (SZETO CHRISTOPHER TZANN-EN [US], et al)
by applicantUS2004015547