blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1750803

EP1750803 - BIOMOLECULAR CONTRAST AGENTS FOR THERAPY SUCCESS AND DOSE MONITORING IN RADIATION THERAPY WITH PROTON OR ION BEAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.05.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.06.2009  [2009/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2007/07]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ABRAHAM-FUCHS, Klaus
Graslitzer Str. 17
91058 Erlangen / DE
02 / MORITZ, Michael
Gollenbach 52
95490 Mistelgau / DE
 [2007/07]
Application number, filing date05747615.217.05.2005
[2007/07]
WO2005EP52256
Priority number, dateUS2004084932818.05.2004         Original published format: US 849328
[2007/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005110545
Date:24.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1750803
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.11.2005
ClassificationIPC:A61N5/10
[2007/07]
CPC:
A61N5/1048 (EP,US); A61N2005/1087 (EP,US); A61N2005/1098 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BIOMOLEKULÄRE KONTRASTMITTEL ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES THERAPIEERFOLGS UND DER DOSIERUNG IN DER STRAHLENTHERAPIE MIT PROTONEN- ODER IONENSTRAHLEN[2007/07]
English:BIOMOLECULAR CONTRAST AGENTS FOR THERAPY SUCCESS AND DOSE MONITORING IN RADIATION THERAPY WITH PROTON OR ION BEAMS[2007/07]
French:AGENTS DE CONTRASTE BIOMOLECULAIRES POUR DETERMINER LA REUSSITE D'UN TRAITEMENT ET METTRE EN OEUVRE UNE SURVEILLANCE DE DOSE EN RADIOTHERAPIE A FAISCEAUX PROTONIQUES OU IONIQUES[2007/07]
Entry into regional phase17.11.2006National basic fee paid 
17.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/07]
23.02.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/25]
21.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200804   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.