Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1896907

EP1896907 - METHOD FOR UPDATING THE PRESENT TIME IN A MOBILE TELEPHONE, APPARATUS USING THE METHOD AND MEMORY TO IMPLEMENT THE METHOD. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2011
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2008/11]
Inventor(s)01 / ROSAY, Arnaud
156 Boulevard Haussmann
F-75008 Paris / FR
 [2008/11]
Representative(s)Zapalowicz, Francis
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Zapalowicz, Francis
Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2008/11]Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan
NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP Department High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date05748057.620.06.2005
[2008/11]
WO2005IB52018
Priority number, dateEP2004030039023.06.2004         Original published format: EP 04300390
[2008/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006000981
Date:05.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1896907
Date:12.03.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006
[2008/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:G04G1/06, G04G5/00
[2008/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/11]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM AKTUALISIEREN DER DERZEITIGEN ZEIT IN EINEM MOBILTELEFON, DAS VERFAHREN BENUTZENDE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHER ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG DES VERFAHRENS[2008/11]
English:METHOD FOR UPDATING THE PRESENT TIME IN A MOBILE TELEPHONE, APPARATUS USING THE METHOD AND MEMORY TO IMPLEMENT THE METHOD.[2008/11]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ACTUALISER L'INDICATION DE LA DATE ET DE L'HEURE, DISPOSITIF UTILISANT UN TEL PROCEDE ET MEMOIRE PERMETTANT LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE[2008/11]
Entry into regional phase23.01.2007National basic fee paid 
23.01.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2007Examination requested  [2008/15]
18.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/13]
05.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1041468  (SAGEM [FR]) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0020] * * paragraph [0027] * * claims 1-6 *