blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1752457

EP1752457 - FUSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.01.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[2007/07]
Inventor(s)01 / ISHIKAWA, Tomoyasu
c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 5328686 / JP
02 / TANIGUCHI, Takahiko
c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 5328686 / JP
03 / BANNO, Hiroshi
c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 5328686 / JP
04 / SETO, Masaki
c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 5328686 / JP
 [2014/12]
Former [2007/07]01 / ISHIKAWA, Tomoyasu, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD
17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 5328686 / JP
02 / TANIGUCHI, Takahiko, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD
17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 5328686 / JP
03 / BANNO, Hiroshi, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 5328686 / JP
04 / SETO, Masaki, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LTD.
17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 5328686 / JP
Representative(s)Dossmann, Gérard, et al
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
[2014/12]
Former [2009/31]Dossmann, Gérard, et al
Bureau CASALONGA & JOSSE Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2007/07]Lewin, John Harvey, et al
Takeda Euro IP Department Arundel Great Court 2 Arundel Street
London WC2R 3DA / GB
Application number, filing date05748463.601.06.2005
[2007/07]
WO2005JP10451
Priority number, dateJP2004016505002.06.2004         Original published format: JP 2004165050
JP2005005823102.03.2005         Original published format: JP 2005058231
[2007/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005118588
Date:15.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1752457
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1752457
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.12.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2010
ClassificationIPC:C07D487/04, C07D487/16, A61K31/519, A61K31/5377, A61K31/551, A61P35/00, A61P43/00
[2007/07]
CPC:
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/5377 (KR); A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP); A61P13/08 (EP); A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP); A61P31/18 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP); A61P35/04 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP); C07D487/16 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/07]
Extension statesAL01.12.2006
BA01.12.2006
HR01.12.2006
LV01.12.2006
MK01.12.2006
YU01.12.2006
TitleGerman:KONDENSIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG[2007/07]
English:FUSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND[2007/07]
French:COMPOSÉ HETEROCYCLIQUE FUSIONNÉ[2007/07]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2006Translation filed 
01.12.2006National basic fee paid 
01.12.2006Search fee paid 
01.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/07]
06.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.2013Fee for grant paid
30.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.06.2012
Opposition(s)22.12.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
24.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.06.2005
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
IE01.06.2014
LU01.06.2014
BG19.06.2014
GB19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU01.06.2005
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
IE01.06.2014
LU01.06.2014
BG19.06.2014
GB19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2016/28]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
IE01.06.2014
LU01.06.2014
BG19.06.2014
GB19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/36]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
IE01.06.2014
LU01.06.2014
BG19.06.2014
GB19.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/24]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
IE01.06.2014
LU01.06.2014
BG19.06.2014
GB19.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/21]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
IE01.06.2014
LU01.06.2014
BG19.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/20]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
LU01.06.2014
BG19.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/18]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
LU01.06.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/09]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
LU01.06.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/08]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
Former [2014/46]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
Former [2014/36]LT19.03.2014
Documents cited:SearchJPS4829796  [ ] (MICROBIOCHEMICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION);
 WO9640142  [ ] (PFIZER [US], et al);
 [E]WO2006010264  (METHYLGENE INC [CA], et al) [E] 1-3,5,6,24,26-29 * table 4; page 191 - page 196; page 224; claims 186, 198 *;
 [E]WO2007054831  (METHYLGENE INC [CA], et al) [E] 1-3,5,6,24,26-29 * table 4; page 194 - page 199; page 227: claims 41,53 *;
 [X]  - SIZOVA, O. S. ET AL, "Pyrrolo[3,2-d]pyrimidine derivatives. IV. Synthesis, antibacterial and antitumor activity of 2,4,7-substituted pyrrolo[3,2-d]pyrimidines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1983:107247, URL: STN, XP002577105 [X] 1,3,5-7,24,26-29 * abstract *
 [X]  - ARNOLD, LEE D. ET AL, "Preparation of heterocyclic ring-fused pyrimidines for treatment of hyperproliferative diseases", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1997:132775, URL: STN, XP002577106 [X] 1,3,5,6,24-29 * abstract *
 [X]  - CAPEK, PETR ET AL, "A facile synthesis of 9-deaza analogue of olomoucine", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2003:277531, URL: STN, XP002577107 [X] 1,3,5-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - UMEZAWA, HAMAO ET AL, "Pyrimidine derivatives", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1973:418760, URL: STN, XP002577108 [X] 1,9,11,12 * abstract *
 [X]  - LETHAM, D. S., "Regulators of cell division in plant tissues. XII. Cytokinin bioassay using excised radish cotyledons", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1972:95567, URL: STN, XP002577109 [X] 1,9,11,12 * abstract *
 [X]  - ZHANG, HAN CHENG ET AL, "Syntheses of 2'-deoxypseudouridine, 2'-deoxyformycin B, and 2',3'-dideoxyformycin B by palladium-mediated glycal-aglycon coupling", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1992:490657, URL: STN, XP002577110 [X] 1,9,11 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH10508875  ;
 [X]JP2000505109  ;
 [X]JP2003502272
by applicant   - "Development of Pharmaceuticals", IYAKUHIN; KAIHATSU, Design of Molecules, PUBLISHED BY HIROKAWA SHOTEN, (1990), vol. 7, pages 163 - 198
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.