Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1752460

EP1752460 - 3-ALKENYLCEPHEM COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
10.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otsuka Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-27, Otedori 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-0021 / JP
[2007/11]
Former [2007/07]For all designated states
Otsuka Chemical Holdings Co., Ltd.
2-27, Otedori 3-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-0021 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIOKA, Yoichi, @c/o Otsuka Chemical Co. Ltd.
463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
02 / SORAJO, Koichi, @c/o Otsuka Chemical Co. Ltd.
463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
03 / KAMEYAMA, Yutaka, @c/o Otsuka Chemical Co. Ltd.
463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
 [2012/09]
Former [2007/07]01 / NISHIOKA, Yoichi, c/o Otsuka Chemical Co. Ltd.
463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
02 / SORAJO, Koichi, c/o Otsuka Chemical Co. Ltd.
463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
03 / KAMEYAMA, Yutaka, c/o Otsuka Chemical Co. Ltd.
463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
Representative(s)Held, Stephan , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/36]Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Anwaltssozietät GbR
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/30]Barz, Peter , et al
Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2
80803 München / DE
Former [2007/07]Barz, Peter , et al
Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2
80803 München / DE
Application number, filing date05748485.902.06.2005
[2007/07]
WO2005JP10531
Priority number, dateJP2004016672604.06.2004         Original published format: JP 2004166726
[2007/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005118596
Date:15.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1752460
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005
[2007/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1752460
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.12.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:C07D501/60, C07D501/04
[2011/40]
Former International [2007/07]C07D501/48, C07D501/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/07]
TitleGerman:3-ALKENYLCEPHEMVERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2007/07]
English:3-ALKENYLCEPHEM COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF[2007/07]
French:COMPOSÉS DE 3-ALCÉNYLCÉPHÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CES COMPOSÉS[2007/07]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2006Translation filed 
05.12.2006National basic fee paid 
05.12.2006Search fee paid 
05.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/07]
16.09.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2011Fee for grant paid
16.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.09.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.11.2012  17.12.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Stötter, Gerd
Bamberger Strasse 49
01187 Dresden / DE
Opponent's representative
Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB, et al
Bamberger Straße 49
01187 Dresden / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/04]
Opponent(s)01  29.11.2012  17.12.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Stötter, Gerd
Bamberger Strasse 49
01187 Dresden / DE
Opponent's representative
Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte, et al
Bamberger Straße 49
01187 Dresden / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
27.02.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.11.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
01.04.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.04.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition28.05.2015Appeal received No.  T1089/15
06.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
21.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
17.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.06.2005
BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
BG29.05.2012
GR30.05.2012
GB02.06.2012
IE02.06.2012
LU02.06.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
DE01.01.2013
TR02.06.2014
[2017/46]
Former [2014/34]HU02.06.2005
BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
BG29.05.2012
GR30.05.2012
GB02.06.2012
IE02.06.2012
LU02.06.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
DE01.01.2013
Former [2014/27]BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
BG29.05.2012
GR30.05.2012
GB02.06.2012
IE02.06.2012
LU02.06.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
DE01.01.2013
Former [2013/33]BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
BG29.05.2012
GR30.05.2012
GB02.06.2012
IE02.06.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
DE01.01.2013
Former [2012/50]BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
Former [2012/49]BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
Former [2012/48]BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
Former [2012/41]BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
Former [2012/37]BE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
Former [2012/36]LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
Former [2012/35]LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
IS29.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT29.02.2012
IS29.06.2012
Former [2012/33]LT29.02.2012
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JP2002234893  ;
 [A]WO9858932  ;
 [A]JPS6219593  ;
 [A]JPS61178991  ;
 [AP]WO2005016936
ExaminationWO2005003141