Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1761176

EP1761176 - SUTURE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/11]SUTURE METHODS AND DEVICES
[2013/15]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ethicon LLC
475 Calle C, Suite 401
Los Frailes Industrial Park
Guaynabo 00969 / PR
[2013/15]
Former [2011/46]For all designated states
Quill Medical, Inc.
1633 Westlake Avenue N., Suite 400
Seattle WA 98109 / US
Former [2008/26]For all designated states
Quill Medical, Inc.
101 West North Bend Way, No. 201
North Bend, WA 98045 / US
Former [2007/11]For all designated states
Quill Medical, Inc.
2505 Meridian Parkway, Suite 150
Research Triangle Park, NC 27713 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RUFF, Gregory, L.
118 Campbell Lane
Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US
02 / LEUNG, Jeffrey C.
4413 White Chapel Way
Raleigh, NC 27615 / US
03 / KAPLAN, Andrew
1027 Crown Court
Hillsborough, NC 27278 / US
04 / MEGARO, Matthew, A.
118 Stoneridge Drive
Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US
05 / BATCHELOR, Stanton, D.
112 Creek Haven Drive
Holly Springs, NC 27540 / US
 [2007/11]
Representative(s)Small, Gary James , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2013/38]
Former [2012/33]Small, Gary James , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2008/31]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Former [2008/15]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Former [2007/11]Bugnion Genève
Bugnion S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Case Postale 375
1211 Genève 12 / CH
Application number, filing date05750101.716.05.2005
[2007/11]
WO2005US17028
Priority number, dateUS20040521528P14.05.2004         Original published format: US 521528 P
[2007/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005112787
Date:01.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1761176
Date:14.03.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005
[2007/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1761176
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.03.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04
[2007/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/11]
TitleGerman:NÄHVORRICHTUNGEN[2013/15]
English:SUTURE DEVICES[2013/15]
French:DISPOSITIFS DE SUTURE[2013/15]
Former [2007/11]NÄHVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN
Former [2007/11]SUTURE METHODS AND DEVICES
Former [2007/11]PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS DE SUTURE
Entry into regional phase11.12.2006National basic fee paid 
11.12.2006Search fee paid 
11.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/11]
19.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.01.2013
30.01.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
06.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
02.04.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2013Fee for grant paid
02.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13168117.3  / EP2664282
EP13168122.3  / EP2664283
EP17178134.7
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.05.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.06.2014  01.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
Opponent's representative
Maschio, Antonio
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2014/32]
Opponent(s)01  18.06.2014  01.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
Opponent's representative
Maschio, Antonio
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
20 Carlton Crescent
Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
25.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.02.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
10.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.12.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition17.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0400/16
20.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.02.2012Request for further processing filed
29.02.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.03.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.05.2005
AT18.09.2013
BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU16.05.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/25]AT18.09.2013
BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU16.05.2014
Former [2015/09]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU16.05.2014
Former [2015/04]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU16.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/28]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/24]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
Former [2014/23]CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
Former [2014/22]CY18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY17.07.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY17.07.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY17.07.2013
LT18.09.2013
Former [2014/08]LT18.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US4950285  (WILK PETER J [US]) [X] 1,8-11,16,17 * columns 4-5 *;
 [X]US5342376  (RUFF GREGORY L [US]) [X] 1,12,13 * column 5; claim 1 *;
 [XY]US6264675  (BROTZ GREGORY R [US]) [X] 1,8-11 * columns 4-6 * [Y] 16-19;
 [X]US2003149447  (MORENCY STEVEN DAVID [US] ET AL) [X] 1,8-11 * paragraphs [0033] - [0037]; figures 1a-9 *;
 [X]WO9014795  (YOON INBAE [US]) [X] 1,10,11,16,17 * pages 11-15; figures 4,11 *;
 [X]US2004060409  (LEUNG JEFFREY C [US] ET AL) [X] 1,11 * figures 1A, 13D *;
 [YA]WO9959477  (WALSHE CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [Y] 16-19 * figures 4a-4d * [A] 1-15
International search[X]US5053047