blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1759014 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1759014



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 250
15.07.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.04.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
29.07.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.12.2012 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
23.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.11.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.11.2012 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
12.11.2012 F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds Appeal 1
12.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.11.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
15.10.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.09.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.06.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.05.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.05.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
19.04.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
19.04.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
19.04.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
19.04.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
05.03.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
05.03.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.03.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.02.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
06.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
06.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
06.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
06.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.02.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
30.09.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.09.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
16.09.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
16.09.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.09.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.09.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.06.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
30.05.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
27.10.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
14.09.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
27.08.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 9
27.08.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
25.08.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 9
25.08.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
18.06.2010 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
21.05.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
21.05.2010 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.05.2010 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 3
21.05.2010 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.05.2010 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.05.2010 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 3
21.05.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
21.05.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
21.05.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
20.05.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
19.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
19.04.2010 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
16.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
16.04.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
16.04.2010 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
09.04.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.02.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
02.11.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.10.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.08.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
24.06.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.06.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
18.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
18.05.2009 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
14.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
14.05.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
14.05.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
14.05.2009 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
05.03.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
03.12.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.11.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
04.08.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
17.07.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.07.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.08.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
07.02.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.02.2007 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
26.01.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
10.01.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
10.01.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
05.01.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
27.10.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.08.2006 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
09.08.2006 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
27.04.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
27.04.2006 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
09.01.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
22.12.2005 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 19
04.07.2005 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
04.07.2005 Claims International Searching Authority 2
04.07.2005 Description International Searching Authority 12
04.07.2005 Drawings International Searching Authority 4