Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1774463

EP1774463 - DYNAMIC BUSINESS METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DIRECT MARKETING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2010
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraser, Eileen A.
Suite 305 3101 Ocean Park Boulevard
Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US
[2007/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2007/16]
Representative(s)MacLachlan & Donaldson
Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road
Citywest Business Campus
Dublin D24 C56E / IE
[N/P]
Former [2007/16]McKeown, Yvonne Mary , et al
c/o MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date05753764.926.05.2005
[2007/16]
WO2005US18562
Priority number, dateUS2004086023103.06.2004         Original published format: US 860231
[2007/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005122041
Date:22.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1774463
Date:18.04.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005
[2007/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.09.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/00
[2007/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DYNAMISCHES UNTERNEHMENSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIREKTEN VERMARKTUNG[2007/16]
English:DYNAMIC BUSINESS METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DIRECT MARKETING[2007/16]
French:PROCEDE DYNAMIQUE D'AFFAIRES ET APPAREIL DE MERCATIQUE DIRECTE[2007/16]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2007National basic fee paid 
03.01.2007Search fee paid 
03.01.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/16]
31.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
14.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination06.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1141/17
21.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.05.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
05.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200804   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2008
31.05.201814   M06   Fee paid on   05.11.2018
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US6597685