blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1784520 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1784520



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 699
21.04.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.04.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
18.04.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
28.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.02.2017 Amended description with annotations Opposition 13
28.02.2017 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
28.02.2017 French translation of claims Opposition 5
28.02.2017 German translation of the claims Opposition 5
28.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.11.2016 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
30.11.2016 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
30.11.2016 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
30.11.2016 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 14
23.11.2016 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
22.11.2016 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
10.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.11.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 33
02.11.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.11.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.10.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.10.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.10.2016 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
07.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
31.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
26.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
26.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
04.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.05.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
27.05.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
27.05.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 18
23.05.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
09.05.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
02.01.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
05.11.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
11.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
30.01.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.01.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 7
06.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.12.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.11.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.09.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.09.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.09.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.09.2012 Claims Appeal 44
21.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.09.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
01.08.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
01.08.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
26.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
26.07.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
26.07.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
23.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.05.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 21
16.05.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 13
16.05.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
16.05.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.05.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 13
16.05.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 15
16.05.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.05.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.05.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.05.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
16.05.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
16.05.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.04.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2012 Claims Opposition 5
17.02.2012 Claims Opposition 5
17.02.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 8
17.02.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
17.02.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 5
17.02.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
17.02.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
15.02.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.11.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.11.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.11.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
02.11.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.11.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2010 Claims Opposition 5
08.12.2010 Claims Opposition 4
08.12.2010 Claims Opposition 4
08.12.2010 Claims Opposition 4
08.12.2010 Claims Opposition 5
08.12.2010 Claims Opposition 4
08.12.2010 Claims Opposition 5
08.12.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
27.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.10.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.09.2010 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
14.09.2010 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.09.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.09.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
13.08.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
08.06.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
08.06.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
06.05.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
20.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.04.2010 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 4
20.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
20.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
20.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
20.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
02.07.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.06.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.06.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
10.06.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
10.06.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.05.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.05.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.05.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.05.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
18.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
18.04.2009 Description Search / examination 3
18.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.04.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
15.04.2009 Description Search / examination 3
15.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.04.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.04.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.01.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.12.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
17.12.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.11.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.11.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.08.2007 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.06.2007 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
02.05.2007 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.04.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.03.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
09.02.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
09.02.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
24.01.2007 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
24.11.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.04.2006 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
07.02.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
19.01.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
19.01.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 22