blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1748738

EP1748738 - A SURGICAL DEVICE FOR CAPTURING, POSITIONING AND ALIGNING PORTIONS OF A SEVERED HUMAN STERNUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mavrek Medical, L.L.C.
6585 South Yale, Suite 315
Tulsa, OK 74136 / US
[2007/06]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, Archibald, S.
6585 S. Yale, Suite 314
Tulsa, OK 74136 / US
 [2007/06]
Representative(s)Nicholls, Michael John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/40]Nicholls, Michael John
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2007/06]Nicholls, Michael John
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date05757575.525.05.2005
[2007/06]
WO2005US18591
Priority number, dateUS2004085777927.05.2004         Original published format: US 857779
[2007/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2005117547
Date:15.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1748738
Date:07.02.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1748738
Date:05.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.05.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2009
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/58, // A61B17/80
[2009/44]
CPC:
A61B17/823 (EP,US); A61B17/8076 (EP,US); A61B17/88 (EP,US);
Y10S606/916 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2007/06]A61B17/58
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/06]
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG; POSITIONIERUNG UND AUSRICHTUNGEN VON TEILEN EINES DURCHTRENNTEN MENSCHLICHEN STERNUMS[2011/20]
English:A SURGICAL DEVICE FOR CAPTURING, POSITIONING AND ALIGNING PORTIONS OF A SEVERED HUMAN STERNUM[2007/06]
French:DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL POUR SAISIR, POSITIONNER ET ALIGNER DES PORTIONS D'UN STERNUM HUMAIN SECTIONNE[2007/06]
Former [2007/06]CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG; POSITIONIERUNG UND AUSRICHTUNGENV ON TEILEN EINES DURCHTRENNTEN MENSCHLICHEN STERNUMS
Entry into regional phase16.11.2006National basic fee paid 
16.11.2006Search fee paid 
16.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.11.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/06]
27.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2011Fee for grant paid
15.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.04.2010
Opposition(s)06.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.05.2005
CY05.10.2011
CZ05.10.2011
EE05.10.2011
FI05.10.2011
LT05.10.2011
PL05.10.2011
RO05.10.2011
SI05.10.2011
SK05.10.2011
TR05.10.2011
BG05.01.2012
GR06.01.2012
IS05.02.2012
PT06.02.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/21]CY05.10.2011
CZ05.10.2011
EE05.10.2011
FI05.10.2011
LT05.10.2011
PL05.10.2011
RO05.10.2011
SI05.10.2011
SK05.10.2011
TR05.10.2011
BG05.01.2012
GR06.01.2012
IS05.02.2012
PT06.02.2012
Former [2013/29]CY05.10.2011
CZ05.10.2011
EE05.10.2011
FI05.10.2011
LT05.10.2011
PL05.10.2011
RO05.10.2011
SI05.10.2011
SK05.10.2011
BG05.01.2012
GR06.01.2012
IS05.02.2012
PT06.02.2012
Former [2012/37]CY05.10.2011
CZ05.10.2011
EE05.10.2011
LT05.10.2011
PL05.10.2011
RO05.10.2011
SI05.10.2011
SK05.10.2011
BG05.01.2012
GR06.01.2012
IS05.02.2012
PT06.02.2012
Former [2012/36]CY05.10.2011
CZ05.10.2011
EE05.10.2011
LT05.10.2011
RO05.10.2011
SI05.10.2011
SK05.10.2011
BG05.01.2012
GR06.01.2012
IS05.02.2012
PT06.02.2012
Former [2012/35]CY05.10.2011
CZ05.10.2011
EE05.10.2011
LT05.10.2011
SI05.10.2011
BG05.01.2012
GR06.01.2012
IS05.02.2012
PT06.02.2012
Former [2012/34]CY05.10.2011
CZ05.10.2011
LT05.10.2011
SI05.10.2011
GR06.01.2012
IS05.02.2012
PT06.02.2012
Former [2012/28]CY05.10.2011
LT05.10.2011
SI05.10.2011
GR06.01.2012
IS05.02.2012
PT06.02.2012
Former [2012/23]LT05.10.2011
SI05.10.2011
GR06.01.2012
IS05.02.2012
PT06.02.2012
Former [2012/21]LT05.10.2011
SI05.10.2011
IS05.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT05.10.2011
SI05.10.2011
Former [2012/11]SI05.10.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]US4201215  (CROSSETT E S [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *;
 [A]US6007538  (LEVIN L SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO02067795  (SYNTHES USA [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 8, line 6 - page 10, line 7 * * page 10, lines 14-16; figures 15-17 *;
 [A]WO03037201  (MILLER ARCHIBALD S [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5941881  (BARNES C LOWRY [US]);
 [Y]US6051007  (HOGENDIJK MIKE [US], et al);
 [A]US6540769  (MILLER III ARCHIBALD S [US]);
 [AE]US6969398  (STEVENS LEONARD [US], et al)
by applicantUS4201215
 US5941881
 US6007538
 WO02067795
 WO03037201
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.