Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1782705

EP1782705 - CLOTHING WITH CROTCH PART [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.07.2010
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.08.2010  [2010/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takeuchi, Shinji
1923-39, Shimosakunobe, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 2130033 / JP
[2007/19]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2007/19]
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/19]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date05758206.606.07.2005
[2007/19]
WO2005JP12452
Priority number, dateJP2004020502312.07.2004         Original published format: JP 2004205023
[2007/19]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006006457
Date:19.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1782705
Date:09.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006
[2007/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.01.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A41B9/02, A41D1/06
[2007/19]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2007/42]
Former [2007/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLEIDUNG MIT SCHRITTTEIL[2007/19]
English:CLOTHING WITH CROTCH PART[2007/19]
French:VETEMENT AVEC PARTIE D"ENTREJAMBES[2007/19]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2007Translation filed 
02.02.2007National basic fee paid 
02.02.2007Search fee paid 
02.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/19]
28.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
09.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/31]
16.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200804   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH02182903  (WACOAL CORP) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract *;
 [X]JPH09111502  (ROMU KK) [X] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [X]DE29707233U  (SCHATZ SIEGFRIED H DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 4, paragraph 3 - paragraph L; figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE445767  (HANS SCHROEDER STRANZ);
 [A]US2763009  (PAULA BLATT) [A] 2;
 [PA]KR20040063336  (NO JAE YEOL) [PA] * abstract *
International search[A]JPH0596002U  ;
 [A]JPS61125105U  ;
 [A]JP2000096302  ;
 [A]JP2001248001  (SANO MICHIKO)