Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1903747

EP1903747 - TRANSMITTING APPARATUS, RECEIVING APPARATUS AND INFORMATION COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.01.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.02.2018  [2018/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Ltd.
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2008/13]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIIZAKI, Kotaro@c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP
02 / JITSUKAWA, Daisuke@c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP
03 / SUDA, Kenji@c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP
04 / SEKI, Hiroyuki@c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP
 [2017/10]
Former [2008/13]01 / SHIIZAKI, Kotaro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP
02 / JITSUKAWA, Daisuke c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP
03 / SUDA, Kenji c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP
04 / SEKI, Hiroyuki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP
Representative(s)Ward, James Norman , et al
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Bürkleinstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/10]Ward, James Norman , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Bürkleinstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Former [2008/13]Ward, James Norman
HASELTINE LAKE 5th Floor, Lincoln House 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date05758321.308.07.2005
[2008/13]
WO2005JP12677
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007007383
Date:18.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1903747
Date:26.03.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007
[2008/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1903747
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.01.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/16, H04L1/18, H04L29/08
[2016/33]
Former International [2012/05]H04L29/08, H04L1/16, H04L1/18, H04L12/56
Former International [2008/13]H04L29/08, H04L1/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2017/10]
Former [2008/33]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2008/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SENDEVORRICHTUNG, EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN[2008/13]
English:TRANSMITTING APPARATUS, RECEIVING APPARATUS AND INFORMATION COMMUNICATION METHOD[2008/13]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION, DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION D INFORMATIONS[2008/13]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2008Translation filed 
04.02.2008National basic fee paid 
04.02.2008Search fee paid 
04.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/13]
09.02.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.03.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
01.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.01.2017Fee for grant paid
18.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.01.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
30.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP12179014.1  / EP2521338
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.09.2012
Opposition(s)11.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
03.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
03.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
02.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
05.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
05.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP1536589  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,7,10-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0012] , [0027] , [0031] , [0066] * [Y] 8,20 [I] 3,5,6,13-19;
 [E]WO2005109729  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [E] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] - [0014] - [0017] , [0018] , [0023] , [0026] , [0028] , [0029] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP1357695  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 8,20 * paragraphs [0072] , [0114] , [0123] *;
 [I]  - ERICSSON, "User plane protocol evolution for evolved UTRAN", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-051742 EUTRAN PROTOCOL EVOLUTION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20050615), vol. RAN WG2, no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20050615, XP050141848 [I] 1-20 * section 3.1 *
 [I]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Node B scheduling of HARQ retransmission", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-040022_SCHEDULING OF HARQ RETRANSMISSION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20040120), vol. RAN WG1, no. Espoo, Finland; 20040120, XP050111951 [I] 1-3,10,11 * section 2 *
International search[X]JPH0746289  (HITACHI LTD, et al);
 [X]JPH0879273  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]JPH09284261  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP)
by applicantJPH1013331
    - D. CHASE, "Code Combining-A Maximum-Likelihood Decoding Approach for Combining an Arbitrary Number of Noisy Packets", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (198505), vol. COM-33, no. 5