Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1761914

EP1761914 - LOW THICKNESS SOUND ABSORPTIVE MULTILAYER COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.07.2010
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2014New entry: Appeal number 
27.06.2014New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/35]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Former [2007/11]For all designated states
3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES COMPANY
Office of Intellectual Property Counsel 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / THOMPSON, Delton R. Jr. 3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
02 / LIU, Xiaohe 3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
 [2007/11]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/11]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date05758703.203.06.2005
[2007/11]
WO2005US19481
Priority number, dateUS2004088454401.07.2004         Original published format: US 884544
[2007/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006007275
Date:19.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1761914
Date:14.03.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006
[2007/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1761914
Date:01.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:G10K11/168
[2007/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/11]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DÜNNER, SCHALLABSORBIERENDER MEHRSCHICHTIGER VERBAND[2007/11]
English:LOW THICKNESS SOUND ABSORPTIVE MULTILAYER COMPOSITE[2007/11]
French:COMPOSITE MULTICOUCHE D'ABSORPTION SONORE DE FAIBLE EPAISSEUR[2007/11]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2007National basic fee paid 
03.01.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.01.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/11]
17.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2010Fee for grant paid
20.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.06.2011  08.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ElringKlinger AG
Max-Eyth-Strasse 2
72581 Dettingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Oberdorfer, Jürgen
nospat Patent- und Rechtsanwälte GbR
Isartorplatz 5
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/28]
Opponent(s)01  01.06.2011  08.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ElringKlinger AG
Max-Eyth-Strasse 2
72581 Dettingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Oberdorfer, Jürgen
nospat Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 5
80331 München / DE
08.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.11.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.04.2014Date of oral proceedings
30.04.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.04.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition25.06.2014Appeal received No.  T1270/14
23.05.2014Appeal received No.  T1270/14
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.09.2010
BE01.09.2010
CY01.09.2010
CZ01.09.2010
DK01.09.2010
EE01.09.2010
FI01.09.2010
HU01.09.2010
IT01.09.2010
LT01.09.2010
NL01.09.2010
PL01.09.2010
RO01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
SI01.09.2010
SK01.09.2010
TR01.09.2010
BG01.12.2010
GR02.12.2010
ES12.12.2010
IS01.01.2011
PT03.01.2011
GB03.06.2011
IE03.06.2011
LU03.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT01.09.2010
BE01.09.2010
CY01.09.2010
CZ01.09.2010
DK01.09.2010
EE01.09.2010
FI01.09.2010
IT01.09.2010
LT01.09.2010
NL01.09.2010
PL01.09.2010
RO01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
SI01.09.2010
SK01.09.2010
TR01.09.2010
BG01.12.2010
GR02.12.2010
ES12.12.2010
IS01.01.2011
PT03.01.2011
GB03.06.2011
IE03.06.2011
LU03.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
Former [2013/42]AT01.09.2010
BE01.09.2010
CY01.09.2010
CZ01.09.2010
DK01.09.2010
EE01.09.2010
FI01.09.2010
IT01.09.2010
LT01.09.2010
NL01.09.2010
PL01.09.2010
RO01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
SI01.09.2010
SK01.09.2010
BG01.12.2010
GR02.12.2010
ES12.12.2010
IS01.01.2011
PT03.01.2011
GB03.06.2011
IE03.06.2011
LU03.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
Former [2011/29]AT01.09.2010
BE01.09.2010
CY01.09.2010
CZ01.09.2010
EE01.09.2010
FI01.09.2010
IT01.09.2010
LT01.09.2010
NL01.09.2010
PL01.09.2010
RO01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
SI01.09.2010
SK01.09.2010
GR02.12.2010
ES12.12.2010
IS01.01.2011
PT03.01.2011
Former [2011/23]AT01.09.2010
CY01.09.2010
CZ01.09.2010
EE01.09.2010
FI01.09.2010
LT01.09.2010
NL01.09.2010
PL01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
SI01.09.2010
SK01.09.2010
GR02.12.2010
IS01.01.2011
Former [2011/16]AT01.09.2010
CY01.09.2010
FI01.09.2010
LT01.09.2010
NL01.09.2010
PL01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
SI01.09.2010
GR02.12.2010
Former [2011/13]AT01.09.2010
CY01.09.2010
FI01.09.2010
LT01.09.2010
PL01.09.2010
SI01.09.2010
Former [2011/11]AT01.09.2010
FI01.09.2010
LT01.09.2010
PL01.09.2010
SI01.09.2010
Former [2011/08]AT01.09.2010
LT01.09.2010
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO2004088025  (RIETER TECHNOLOGIES AG; ANDEREGG, PETER) [PX] 1-6,10,11 * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 22; figures 3a,3b; claims 8-12 *;
 [DX]CA2350477  (RIETER AUTOMOTIVE AG) [DX] 1-6,10-17,21,22 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 14; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO0140025  (RIETER AUTOMOTIVE AG; BOUKOBZA, ALAIN; DANIEL, JEAN, FRANCOIS; REYMON) [X] 1-6,10-17,21,22 * page 5, line 6 - line 17; figure 1; claims 1,2,10,11 *;
 [X]US2003003267  (ALTS THORSTEN ET AL) [X] 1-6,10-17,21,22 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2003116379  (KHAMBETE SURENDRA ET AL) [A] 7,18 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2004023014  (WILLIAMSON BRUCE SCOTT ET AL) [A] 8,9,19,20 * paragraph [0032] *