Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1769400

EP1769400 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATED MIGRATION OF MEDIA ARCHIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oracle International Corporation
500 Oracle Parkway
M/S 5OP7
Redwood Shores, California 94065-1677 / US
[2017/09]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Front Porch Digital, Inc.
2011 Cherry Street
Suite 204
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
Former [2009/16]For all designated states
Samma Systems, LLC
450 West 31st Street, 4th Floor
New York, NY 10001 / US
Former [2007/14]For all designated states
Media Matters LLC
450 West 31th Street, 4th Floor
New York, NY 10018 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DÁVILA, Ralph, Justin
250 Broome Street, Penthouse 21
New York, NY 1002-3828 / US
02 / LINDNER, James, Alan
Apartment 2M, 15 Washington Place
New York, NY 10003 / US
 [2007/14]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond , et al
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[2018/10]
Former [2009/16]Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond , et al
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
Former [2009/15]Weber, Martin
Jones Day Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2007/14]Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date05761850.624.06.2005
[2007/14]
WO2005US22551
Priority number, dateUS20040583172P25.06.2004         Original published format: US 583172 P
[2007/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006012328
Date:02.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1769400
Date:04.04.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006
[2007/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1769400
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.02.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/00
[2008/10]
Former International [2007/14]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/10]
Former [2007/14]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN MIGRATION VON MEDIA-ARCHIVEN[2007/14]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATED MIGRATION OF MEDIA ARCHIVES[2007/14]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE MIGRATION AUTOMATIQUE D'ARCHIVES MULTIMEDIAS[2007/14]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2007National basic fee paid 
22.01.2007Search fee paid 
22.01.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.01.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/14]
30.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.07.2017
10.07.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
06.12.2017Fee for grant paid
06.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.01.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
24.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2011
Opposition(s)10.12.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
09.06.2014Request for further processing filed
09.06.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.06.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201511   M06   Fee paid on   10.12.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
LU24.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
[2019/17]
Former [2019/15]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/13]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/47]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/45]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/36]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
Former [2018/35]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2002147881  (PUDIPEDDI RAVISANKAR [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2004117429  (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9735312  (ALLEN RICHARD D [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5764972  (CROUSE DONALD D [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - KOHL J T ET AL, "HighLight: using a log-structured file system for tertiary storage management", PROCEEDINGS OF THE WINTER USENIX CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (19930125), pages 435 - 447, XP002194841 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KOHL J ET AL, "HighLight: a file system for tertiary storage", MASS STORAGE SYSTEMS, 1993. PUTTING ALL THAT DATA TO WORK. PROCEEDINGS ., TWELFTH IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON MONTEREY, CA, USA 26-29 APRIL 1993, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19930426), ISBN 978-0-8186-3460-4, pages 157 - 161, XP010095430 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MASS.1993.289765
International search[Y]US4338391  (NACCI GEORGE R, et al);
 [Y]US5152028  (HIRANO AKIHIRO [JP]);
 [X]  - ANONYMOUS, "DVD X RESCUE - Your DVD Repair Doctor is in!", (20031205), pages 1 - 2
 [Y]  - ANONYMOUS, "LTO Cartridge Tape Cleaner/Inspector", BOW INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED LTO SERIES, (20040121), pages 1 - 3, XP008116291
 [X]  - GENE1219, "backup process", (20031219), page 1