Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1773976

EP1773976 - DISPOSABLE BIOREACTOR SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
05.12.2019Change - applicantpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Global Life Sciences Solutions USA LLC
100 Results Way
Marlborough, MA 01752 / US
[2020/01]
Former [2016/36]For all designated states
GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences Corp.
800 Centennial Avenue
Piscataway, NJ 08855 / US
Former [2014/14]For all designated states
GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences Corp.
800 Centennial Avenue
Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US
Former [2007/16]For all designated states
Xcellerex, Inc.
170 Locke drive
Marlborough, MA 01752 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HODGE, Geoffrey
146 Mendon Road
Sutton, MA 01590 / US
02 / GALLIHER, Parrish
28 Old Pickard Lane
Littleton, MA 01590 / US
03 / FISHER, Michael
269 Winter Street
Ashland, MA 01721 / US
 [2007/16]
Representative(s)Larsson, Jan Anders , et al
GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB
Björkgatan 30
751 84 Uppsala / SE
[2016/49]
Former [2012/52]Stavbom, Ellen Elisabet , et al
GE HealthCare
Life Sciences
Björkgatan 30
751 84 Uppsala / SE
Former [2009/40]Graf von Stosch, Andreas , et al
Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22
80538 München / DE
Former [2008/35]Williams, Richard Andrew Norman
Harrison Goddard Foote 40- 43 Chancery Lane London
WC2A 1JA / GB
Former [2008/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2007/41]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2007/16]Crump, Julian Richard John , et al
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9 Ironmonger Lane
London EC2V 8EY / GB
Application number, filing date05763165.706.06.2005
[2007/16]
WO2005US20083
Priority number, dateUS20040577143P04.06.2004         Original published format: US 577143 P
US20050669252P07.04.2005         Original published format: US 669252 P
[2007/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005118771
Date:15.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1773976
Date:18.04.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005
[2007/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1773976
Date:07.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/49]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1773976
Date:01.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/00, C12M1/06, C12M1/34, C12M1/36, B01F13/08, B01F15/00
[2016/34]
Former International [2007/16]C12M1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/49]
Former [2007/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINWEGBIOREAKTORSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN[2007/16]
English:DISPOSABLE BIOREACTOR SYSTEMS AND METHODS[2007/16]
French:SYSTÈMES DE BIORÉACTEURS JETABLES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS[2019/32]
Former [2007/16]SYSTEMES DE BIOREACTEURS JETABLES ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES
Entry into regional phase03.01.2007National basic fee paid 
03.01.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/16]
01.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2016Fee for grant paid
26.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.12.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.08.2017  28.09.2018  WITHDRAWN
SARTORIUS STEDIM BIOTECH GMBH
August-Spindler-Strasse 11
37079 Göttingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Prinz & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
 [2018/45]
Former [2017/41]
Opponent(s)01  30.08.2017   
SARTORIUS STEDIM BIOTECH GMBH
August-Spindler-Strasse 11
37079 Göttingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Prinz & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
10.10.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.02.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.02.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.03.2019
18.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
20.03.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.03.2019Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.07.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.10.2019Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
17.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
16.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.06.2005
BE07.12.2016
CY07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
LU06.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU06.06.2005
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
LU06.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/21]BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
LU06.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/11]BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/52]BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/42]BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/35]CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
GR08.03.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003036192  (SINGH VIJAY [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1-13 *;
 [D]US6544788  ;
 [X]US2004062140  (CADOGAN DAVID PHILLIP [US], et al) [X] 1,23 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0026] *;
 [X]US2003008389  (CARLL KENNETH B [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0022] *;
 [X]GB2202549  (WHITNEY PHILIP JOHN) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 7 *;
 [X]FR2799138  (OPIFEX [FR]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 13 - line 31 *;
 [X]US6432698  (GAUGLER RANDY [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 52 *;
 [A]EP0200792  (MARKL HERBERT DR ING) [A] 1 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 27 *
OppositionUS2003036192
 US2004062140
 US2003008389
 GB2202549
 FR2799138
 US6432698
 EP0200792
 WO03028869
 US2002138454
 WO0046354
 GB1579012
 EP0343885
 WO0011953
 US4668632
 WO9813469