Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1768756

EP1768756 - PLAYING CARDS WITH SEPARABLE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2009
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 05.01.2011  [2011/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BALLY GAMING INTERNATIONAL, INC.
6601 South Bermuda Road Las Vegas
Nevada 89119 / US
[2007/14]
Inventor(s)01 / SOLTYS, Richard
14529 Southeast 85th Street
Newcastle, WA 98059 / US
02 / HUIZINGA, Richard
14529 Southeast 85th Street
Newcastle, WA 98059 / US
03 / FLECKENSTEIN, Allen
13212 Southeast 51st Place
Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US
 [2007/14]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/14]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05764258.928.06.2005
[2007/14]
WO2005US23276
Priority number, dateUS20040584395P30.06.2004         Original published format: US 584395 P
[2007/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006004926
Date:12.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1768756
Date:04.04.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006
[2007/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1768756
Date:28.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:A63F1/02
[2007/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/14]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KARTENSPIELE MIT TRENNBAREN KOMPONENTEN[2007/14]
English:PLAYING CARDS WITH SEPARABLE COMPONENTS[2007/14]
French:CARTES A JOUER A ELEMENTS SEPARABLES[2007/14]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2007National basic fee paid 
04.01.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/14]
23.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2008Fee for grant paid
03.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
LT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
PL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
TR28.05.2008
IE28.06.2008
LU28.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
GR29.08.2008
IS28.09.2008
HU29.11.2008
[2011/01]
Former [2010/39]CY28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
LT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
PL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
TR28.05.2008
IE28.06.2008
LU28.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
IS28.09.2008
HU29.11.2008
Former [2010/33]CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
LT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
PL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
IE28.06.2008
LU28.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
IS28.09.2008
Former [2010/24]CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
LT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
PL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
IE28.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
IS28.09.2008
Former [2009/27]CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
LT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
IE28.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
IS28.09.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
LT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE28.08.2008
IS28.09.2008
Former [2009/14]CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
LT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE28.08.2008
IS28.09.2008
Former [2009/13]CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
LT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE28.08.2008
IS28.09.2008
Former [2009/09]DK28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE28.08.2008
IS28.09.2008
Former [2009/07]FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE28.08.2008
IS28.09.2008
Former [2009/05]FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
IS28.09.2008
Former [2008/50]FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
Former [2008/44]SI28.05.2008
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2694662  (HUNTER JR WALKER F) [X] 1,5,8-11 * column 1, line 22 - line 24 * * column 4, line 49 - line 65 * * claims 4,5 * * figure - * [Y] 2-4;
 [X]FR2775196  (GEMPLUS SCA [FR]) [X] 1,7 * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 15 * * page 7, line 6 - line 24 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4244582  (RAEES MOHAMMAD, et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,3 * * figure - *;
 [Y]US5067713  (SOULES JACK A [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 32 * * figures 6,7 *