blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1874193 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1874193



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 433
09.11.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 2
30.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.10.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 26
11.10.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.09.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
04.09.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Appeal 2
08.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
08.08.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.08.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.08.2017 Claims Appeal 5
08.08.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.08.2017 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
07.08.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.08.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.07.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
24.07.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.06.2017 Communication about missing advise for delivery Appeal 2
05.05.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
05.05.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
02.05.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.03.2017 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
18.01.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
16.01.2017 General enquiry Appeal 2
15.07.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.07.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.07.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.07.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
28.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 4
02.08.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
02.08.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 5
27.06.2013 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
05.02.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
24.01.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
14.12.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.12.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.12.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.12.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.12.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.12.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.12.2012 Claims Appeal 4
14.12.2012 Claims Appeal 3
14.12.2012 Drawings Appeal 1
14.12.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
14.12.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
14.12.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
14.12.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
14.12.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
14.12.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
14.12.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
11.12.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 31
07.12.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 32
05.10.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
05.10.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.10.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
01.10.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
01.10.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 2
25.08.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
21.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
07.08.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.08.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
07.08.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
07.08.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
07.08.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.06.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.06.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
15.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.06.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
11.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.06.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
11.06.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.05.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
15.05.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.05.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.05.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.05.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.10.2011 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
26.10.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
20.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.10.2011 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
20.10.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
09.09.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.09.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.08.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.07.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.07.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.07.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
19.07.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
19.07.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.07.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.05.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.05.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.06.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.06.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 3
07.04.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
07.04.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 10
31.03.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
31.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.03.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
31.03.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 7
24.02.2010 Extension of time limit granted Search / examination 1
11.02.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.02.2010 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
01.02.2010 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 3
01.02.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.12.2009 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
18.11.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.11.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 3
18.11.2009 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
12.12.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.11.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
14.11.2007 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.11.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
29.10.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 3
24.08.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.11.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
19.10.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.10.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 17