Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1779470

EP1779470 - COMPRESSION CONNECTOR FOR COAXIAL CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.10.2012
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.
6176 East Molloy Road
East Syracuse, NY 13057-0278 / US
[2007/18]
Inventor(s)01 / MONTENA, Noah
124 Buckingham Avenue
Syracuse, NY 13210 / US
 [2007/18]
Representative(s)Bittner, Thomas L. , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/22]Bittner, Thomas L. , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2010/49]KATZAROV S.A.
European Patent Attorneys 19, rue des Epinettes
1227 Genève / CH
Former [2010/44]Heyer, Volker , et al
Bockhorni & Kollegen Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
Former [2007/18]Heyer, Volker , et al
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Graalfs Wehnert Döring Siemons Schildberg Schwanthalerstraße 106
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date05770000.711.07.2005
[2007/18]
WO2005US24407
Priority number, dateUS2004089264516.07.2004         Original published format: US 892645
[2007/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006019647
Date:23.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1779470
Date:02.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006
[2007/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1779470
Date:30.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.02.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01R9/05
[2007/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/18]
TitleGerman:KOMPRESSIONSVERBINDER FÜR KOAXIALKABEL[2007/18]
English:COMPRESSION CONNECTOR FOR COAXIAL CABLE[2007/18]
French:CONNECTEUR À COMPRIMER POUR CÂBLE COAXIAL[2007/18]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2007National basic fee paid 
16.01.2007Search fee paid 
16.01.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/18]
21.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2010
08.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.11.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
13.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2011Fee for grant paid
17.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10012907.1  / EP2348580
EP10012908.9  / EP2348581
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.01.2008
Opposition(s)31.08.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.07.2005
AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
FI30.11.2011
IT30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
PL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
TR30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
IE11.07.2012
LU11.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
FR31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
FI30.11.2011
IT30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
PL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
TR30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
IE11.07.2012
LU11.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
FR31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2014/21]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
FI30.11.2011
IT30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
PL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
TR30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
IE11.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
FR31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/33]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
FI30.11.2011
IT30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
PL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
IE11.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
FR31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/29]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
FI30.11.2011
IT30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
PL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
CH31.07.2012
FR31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/23]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
IT30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
PL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
CH31.07.2012
FR31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/22]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
IT30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
PL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/20]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
IT30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
PL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/11]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
IT30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
PL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
IT30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
PL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/37]BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
IT30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
PL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/36]BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/35]BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/34]BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/28]BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/25]BE30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/23]LT30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/21]LT30.11.2011
IS30.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT30.11.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6331123  (RODRIGUES JULIO F [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,12-17,19-22,25-30,32-34,37-43 * figure 2A * [Y] 5,10,11,18,23,24,31,35,36;
 [Y]US5879191  (BURRIS DONALD A [US]) [Y] 10,11,23,24,35,36 * figure 8 *;
 [A]US5338225  (JACOBSEN INGOLF G [US] ET AL) [A] 10,23,35 * figure 4 *;
 [Y]WO03043137  (CORNING GILBERT INC [US]) [Y] 5,18,31 * figure 1 *
International search[X]US5879191  (BURRIS DONALD A [US]);
 [X]US6331123  (RODRIGUES JULIO F [US])
by applicantWO03043137
 US5338225
 US5879191
 US6331123