Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1781881

EP1781881 - MOUNTING PLATE FOR ADJUSTABLY RETAINING FURNITURE HINGES ON THE FRAME OF PIECES OF FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEPLA-WERKE LAUTENSCHLÄGER GmbH & Co. KG
Egerländerstrasse 2
D-64354 Reinheim / DE
[2007/19]
Inventor(s)01 / EBERL, Thorsten
Zellstrasse 34
64367 Mühltal / DE
02 / HERPER, Markus
Flutgraben 5
64367 Mühltal / DE
 [2007/19]
Representative(s)Helber, Friedrich , et al
Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner Patentanwälte Scheuergasse 24
64673 Zwingenberg / DE
[2007/19]
Application number, filing date05770678.010.08.2005
[2007/19]
WO2005EP08662
Priority number, dateDE20042013401U27.08.2004         Original published format: DE 202004013401 U
[2007/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006024374
Date:09.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1781881
Date:09.05.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006
[2007/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1781881
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:E05D7/04
[2007/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   IT [2007/49]
Former [2007/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MONTAGEPLATTE ZUR VERSTELLBAREN HALTERUNG VON MÖBELSCHARNIEREN AM KORPUS VON MÖBELSTÜCKEN[2007/19]
English:MOUNTING PLATE FOR ADJUSTABLY RETAINING FURNITURE HINGES ON THE FRAME OF PIECES OF FURNITURE[2007/19]
French:PLAQUE DE MONTAGE POUR FIXER DE MANIERE MOBILE, DES CHARNIERES DE MEUBLES SUR LE CORPS DE MEUBLES[2007/19]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2007National basic fee paid 
29.01.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/19]
18.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2008Fee for grant paid
21.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XAY]DE7820305U  (PAUL HETTICH & CO, 4983 KIRCHLENGERN) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 16 * * page 3, line 26 - page 6, line 17; figures 1-12; claims 1-9 * [A] 8-10 [Y] 6,7;
 [XAY]DE8313305U  (RICHARD HEINZE GMBH & CO KG, 4900 HERFORD, DE) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 1, line 14 - page 2, line 10 * * page 3A, line 1 - page 7, line 18; figures 1-6; claim 1 * [A] 3-5,8-10 [Y] 6,7;
 [XAY]DE10015805  (FERRARI FRANCO [IT]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 1, lines 30-48 * * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 10; figures 1,2; claims 1-11 * [A] 3-5,8-10 [Y] 6,7;
 [XA]US6266848  (FRACCARO GEORG [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 3, line 20 - column 6, line 24; figures 2-16; claims 1-7 * [A] 3-5,8-10;
 [X]DE2406438  (PRAEMETA) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *