Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1761835

EP1761835 - SECURITY MODULE AND METHOD OF CUSTOMISING ONE SUCH MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  04.04.2014
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.05.2014  [2014/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nagravision S.A.
Route de Genève 22-24
1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH
[2009/46]
Former [2007/11]For all designated states
NagraCard SA
22, route de Genève
1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH
Inventor(s)01 / STRANSKY, Philippe
Chemin des Grands-Champs
1033 Cheuseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH
 [2007/11]
Representative(s)Leman Consulting S.A.
Chemin de Précossy 31
1260 Nyon / CH
[2011/43]
Former [2007/11]Leman Consulting S.A.
Route de Clémenty, 62
CH-1260 Nyon / CH
Application number, filing date05771823.127.06.2005
[2007/11]
WO2005EP52988
Priority number, dateEP2004010305329.06.2004         Original published format: EP 04103053
[2007/11]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006000584
Date:05.01.2006
Language:FR
[2006/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1761835
Date:14.03.2007
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006
[2007/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1761835
Date:26.10.2011
Language:FR
[2011/43]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP05.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2007/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/11]
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSMODUL UND VERFAHREN ZUR INDIVIDUELLEN ANPASSUNG EINES DERARTIGEN MODULS[2007/11]
English:SECURITY MODULE AND METHOD OF CUSTOMISING ONE SUCH MODULE[2007/11]
French:MODULE DE SÉCURITÉ ET MÉTHODE DE PERSONNALISATION D'UN TEL MODULE DE SÉCURITÉ[2007/11]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2006National basic fee paid 
05.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/11]
11.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2011Fee for grant paid
15.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.04.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.07.2012  26.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Brunner, John Michael Owen / Morris, Claire Louise
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Opponent's representative
Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2012/35]
Opponent(s)01  23.07.2012  26.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Brunner, John Michael Owen / Morris, Claire Louise
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Opponent's representative
Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row
GB-London WC1B 5HA / GB
30.08.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.02.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.12.2013Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.12.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
30.12.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
TR26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
[2014/21]
Former [2013/29]AT26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2012/34]CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/28]CY26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/26]LT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/24]LT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/23]LT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/21]LT26.10.2011
IS26.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT26.10.2011
Cited inInternational search[XY]US6725374  (JAHNICH MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 36 - line 47 * * column 6, line 25 - line 65; figure 5 * [Y] 6;
 [XY]EP1178406  (AVAYA TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [X] 7-12 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0014]; figure 3 * [Y] 6