blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1761835 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1761835



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 589
15.09.2017 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
03.04.2014 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
03.04.2014 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
18.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.12.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
20.12.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.12.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
20.12.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
20.12.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.12.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
20.12.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.12.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.12.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.12.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 4
04.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 11
04.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.12.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.12.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.11.2013 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
29.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
29.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
29.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
26.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
26.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
05.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
05.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
05.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
05.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
05.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
05.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.10.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2013 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
19.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
20.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 3
01.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.07.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
08.07.2013 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
18.06.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
18.06.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.06.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.06.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
05.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.05.2013 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
21.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
02.05.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.05.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.05.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.02.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
11.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.12.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.08.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.08.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.07.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.07.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.07.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.07.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 13
23.07.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.07.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
23.07.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
29.09.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.07.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
15.07.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.07.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.07.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
25.01.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
08.10.2009 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
02.10.2009 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 5
11.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
11.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
11.08.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
09.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
09.08.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
11.04.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
11.04.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.02.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.02.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
24.01.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
05.12.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission for entry into the European phase Search / examination 1
05.12.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
10.11.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.01.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
05.01.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
05.01.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
05.01.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 23
22.08.2005 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.08.2005 Claims International Searching Authority 3
22.08.2005 Description International Searching Authority 16
22.08.2005 Drawings International Searching Authority 2
27.06.2005 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
27.06.2005 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
27.06.2005 Description PCT receiving Office 16
27.06.2005 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2