blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1761835


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
04.04.2014 Revocation of patent published on  07.05.2014  [2014/19]
20.12.2013 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.12.2013 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
14.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.07.2013  [2013/29]
26.04.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
25.02.2013 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.12.2012 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
30.08.2012 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
27.07.2012 Opposition filed published on  29.08.2012  [2012/35]
20.07.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2012  [2012/34]
08.06.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2012  [2012/28]
25.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
18.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2012  [2012/25]
11.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2012  [2012/24]
04.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2012  [2012/23]
21.04.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2012  [2012/21]
13.04.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.05.2012  [2012/20]
23.09.2011 (Expected) grant published on  26.10.2011  [2011/43]
21.09.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.09.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
05.07.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.06.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.07.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.10.2009 Change - applicant published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
20.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.08.2007 Change - extension states published on  03.10.2007  [2007/40]
10.08.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.04.2007 First examination report
05.04.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.02.2007 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.03.2007  [2007/11]
09.02.2007 Request for examination filed published on  14.03.2007  [2007/11]
06.01.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
13.12.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
13.12.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.12.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
08.06.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
08.02.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
07.02.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
03.11.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
11.10.2005 PCT data prior to European publication