Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1761835

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 26.10.2011
 BELapse: 30.06.2012
 BGLapse: 26.01.2012
 CHLapse: 30.06.2012
CYLapse: 26.10.2011
 CZLapse: 26.10.2011
 DE 
 DKLapse: 26.10.2011
 EELapse: 26.10.2011
 ES 
 FILapse: 26.10.2011
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 27.01.2012
 HU 
 IELapse: 26.10.2011
 ISLapse: 26.02.2012
IT 
 LILapse: 30.06.2012
 LTLapse: 26.10.2011
 LU 
 MCLapse: 30.06.2012
 NLLapse: 26.10.2011
 PLLapse: 26.10.2011
 PTLapse: 27.02.2012
 ROLapse: 26.10.2011
 SELapse: 26.10.2011
 SILapse: 26.10.2011
 SKLapse: 26.10.2011
 TRLapse: 26.10.2011
Examination procedure15.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase05.12.2006National basic fee paid 
05.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted26.10.2011
Opposition procedure30.12.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent published on 07.05.2014 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:14.03.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20061205
 
Event date:14.03.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:09.05.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20070411
 
Event date:03.10.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:11.11.2009 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:NAGRAVISION S.A.
 
Event date:26.10.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:26.10.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:31.10.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:23.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:15.12.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602005030859 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20111215
 
Event date:15.02.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL VDEP
Code Expl.:-INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:01.03.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2375484 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20120301
 
Event date:26.03.2012 
Event description:LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:15.04.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 530975 AT T
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:30.04.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120226
 
Event date:30.04.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.05.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.05.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.05.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120227
 
Event date:31.05.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.05.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.05.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120127
 
Event date:06.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FD4D
Code Expl.:-EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID
 
Event date:29.06.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120126
 
Event date:29.08.2012 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:BRUNNER, JOHN MICHAEL OWEN / MORRIS, CLAIRE LOUISE
Effective DATE:20120723
 
Event date:31.08.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:18.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602005030859 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20120723
 
Event date:31.12.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20120627
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.12.2012 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:NAGRAVISION S.A.
Effective DATE:20120630
 
Event date:31.01.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:31.01.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120630
 
Event date:31.01.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:15.02.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120630
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120630
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120630
 
Event date:28.06.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20130620
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20130619
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20130624
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20130703
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R103 602005030859 DE
Code Expl.:-PATENT REVOKED BY EPO
 
Event date:30.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R064 602005030859 DE
Code Expl.:-EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20111026
 
Event date:07.05.2014 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:20131230
 
Event date:07.05.2014 
Event description:GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE
Effective DATE:20131230
 
Event date:12.06.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R107 602005030859 DE
Code Expl.:-PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED
Effective DATE:20140612