Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1781607

EP1781607 - PYRROLIDINE DERIVATIVES AS MUSCARINIC RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.09.2010
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2010  [2010/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited
Plot No. 90, Sector-32 Gurgaon
Haryana 122001, Delhi / IN
[2007/19]
Inventor(s)01 / SALMAN, Mohammad
12 Jackson Avenue
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
02 / SARMA, Pakala Kumara Savithru
1091, 17B FFCO Colony
Gurgaon, Haryana 122001 / IN
03 / SHELKE, Sandeep Y. Flat No. 6 Shiv-krupa Society
Katrap Road No. 2 Kulgaon-Badlapur
Thane 421 503 Maharasht / IN
04 / CHUGH, Anita
RA-36, Inderpuri
New Delhi 110012 / IN
05 / GUPTA, Suman
482, Sector-14
Gurgaon, Haryana 122001 / IN
 [2007/32]
Former [2007/19]01 / SALMAN, Mohammad
13 Hampshire Drive
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
02 / SARMA, Pakala Kumara Savithru
1091, 17B FFCO Colony
Gurgaon, Haryana 122001 / IN
03 / SHELKE, Sandeep Y. Flat No. 6 Shiv-krupa Society
Katrap Road No. 2 Kulgaon-Badlapur
Thane 421 503 Maharasht / IN
04 / CHUGH, Anita
RA-36, Inderpuri
New Delhi 110012 / IN
05 / GUPTA, Suman
482, Sector-14
Gurgaon, Haryana 122001 / IN
Representative(s)Cronin, Brian Harold John
CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31
1260 Nyon / CH
[2007/19]
Application number, filing date05771884.318.08.2005
[2007/19]
WO2005IB02449
Priority number, dateIN2004DE0155019.08.2004         Original published format: IN DE15502004
IN2005DE0179611.07.2005         Original published format: IN DE17962005
[2007/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006018708
Date:23.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1781607
Date:09.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006
[2007/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:C07D207/12, C07D405/06, A61K31/40, A61K31/4025, A61P3/04, A61P11/00
[2007/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PYRROLIDINDERIVATE ALS ANTAGONISTEN DES MUSCARINREZEPTORS[2007/19]
English:PYRROLIDINE DERIVATIVES AS MUSCARINIC RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS[2007/19]
French:DERIVES DE PYRROLIDINE UTILISES EN TANT QU'ANTAGONISTES DES RECEPTEURS MUSCARINIQUES[2007/19]
Entry into regional phase19.03.2007National basic fee paid 
19.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/19]
02.05.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/40]
12.05.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XD]WO2004056767  (RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED; MEHTA, ANITA; GUPTA, JANG, BAHADUR; SARM) [XD] 1-38 * claims 1,4-8; tables 1,2 *;
 [X]US3091570  (BIEL JOHN H) [X] 1-38 * column 1, line 14 - line 36 * * column 2, line 23 - line 39 *;
 [X]US4208423  (PFISTER, JURG R) [X] 1-18 * column 8, line 9 - column 9, line 10 * * column 1, line 44 - line 59 *
 [X]  - TANIGUCHI K ET AL, "AGENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF OVERACTIVE DETRUSOR. VI. SYNTHESIS AND PHARMACOLOGICAL PROPERTIES OF ACETAMIDE DERIVATIVES BEARING CYCLIC AMINES IN N-SUBSTITUENTS", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (1994), vol. 42, no. 1, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 74 - 84, XP002067286 [X] 1-38 * page 79; table 3; compound 4I *
 [X]  - TANIGUCHI K ET AL, "Agents for the treatment of overactive detrusor. VI. Synthesis and pharmacological properties of acetamide derivatives bearing cyclic amines in N-substituents.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (199401), Database accession no. NLM8124770, XP002362582 [X] 1-17,19-23 * abstract *
    [ ] - CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN. JAN 1994, (199401), vol. 42, no. 1, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 74 - 84
    [ ] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN CROSSFIRE INSTITUT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER CHEMISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN, DE, (1994), XP002362583 [ ] * column A *
 [X]  - CZECHE S ET AL, "Antimuscarinic Properties of the stereoisomers of Glycopyrronium Bromide", LIFE SCIENCES. 1997, (1997), vol. 60, ISSN 0024-3205, pages 1167 - 1167, XP002362548 [X] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0024-3205(97)84306-8
 [X]  - FRANKO B V ET AL, "DERIVATIVES OF 3-PYRROLIDINOLS-III. THE CHEMISTRY, PHARMACOLOGY, AND TOXICOLOGY OF SOME N-SUBSTITUTED-3-PYRROLIDYL ALPHA-SUBSTITUTED PHENYLACETATES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON, US, (1960), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 523 - 540, XP008021298 [X] 1-38 * page 538, paragraph L; table 1; compounds IIA, IIB *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm50012a004
 [X]  - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN CROSSFIRE INSTITUT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER CHEMISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN, DE, (1993), XP002362584 [X] 1-18 * column A *
    [ ] - BHAT K L ET AL, SYNTH. COMMUN., (1985), vol. 15, no. 7, pages 587 - 598